|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 06/01/1917 | 24/03/1917 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1665 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1922 | 17/06/1922 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1923 | 09/02/1924 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18) Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5166 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1925 | 31/12/1925 | 69 days | General | |||
Nine Elms Works | 23/07/1926 | 30/07/1926 | 8 days | Light Repair | Converted to oil burnng |
||
Nine Elms Works | 09/03/1927 | 09/03/1927 | 1 day | Unclassified | Oil burning equipment removed |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1927 | 31/12/1927 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1929 | 03/08/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1931 | 30/05/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1934 | 10/03/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 714 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1937 | 31/12/1937 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1939 | 04/02/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 276 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1941 | 15/02/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 384 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1943 | 10/07/1943 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1945 | 31/03/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1947 | 24/05/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1948 | 27/11/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 968 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69801 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1951 | 10/02/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22365 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1951 | 27/10/1951 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1952 | 17/06/1952 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1953 | 02/07/1953 | 176 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22398 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1955 | 28/05/1955 | 75 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1955 | 21/06/1955 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1958 | 25/04/1958 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22380 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1960 | 01/03/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/04/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 166 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
06/01/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1917. Dep: 24/03/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1665 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1922. Dep: 17/06/1922. | ||
10/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1923. Dep: 09/02/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18) Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5166 |
||
24/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925. | ||
23/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Nine Elms Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/07/1926. Dep: 30/07/1926. Work undertaken: Converted to oil burnng |
||
09/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Nine Elms Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1927. Dep: 09/03/1927. Work undertaken: Oil burning equipment removed |
||
22/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 31/12/1927. | ||
15/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929. | ||
25/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 30/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) |
||
10/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1934. Dep: 10/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 714 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 31/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18) |
||
14/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 276 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 384 (Diagram 18) |
||
08/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 10/07/1943. | ||
03/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9801 | ||
12/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 968 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69801 |
||
30/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
31/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
10/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22365 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
03/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1951. Dep: 27/10/1951. | ||
20/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1952. Dep: 17/06/1952. | ||
08/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 02/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22398 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955. | ||
16/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 21/06/1955. | ||
07/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
12/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1958. Dep: 25/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22380 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69801 from Gorton (9G) | ||
01/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/03/1960. Dep: 01/03/1960. | ||
05/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |