Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 19 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1856 Week
» 13001 Month
» 112786 Year
» 1778162 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 168 on 20/05/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5168   28/06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9803 on 24/03/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E9803   06/03/1948
British Railways 69803   29/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Tue 20/05/1911 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Tue 23/06/1959 off Lincoln (40A)
Service Life 48 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
NEA   Neasden (New) on 20/05/1911
ARD   Ardsley on 20/11/1924
NEA   Neasden on 28/07/1927
LIN   Lincoln on 11/07/1948
LIN   Lincoln w/e 17/07/1948
GRA   Grantham on 10/07/1949
GRA   Grantham w/e 16/07/1949
40F   Boston on 29/10/1950
40B   Immingham on 28/08/1955
40E   Langwith Junction on 24/06/1956
38D   Staveley (G.C.) on 28/10/1956
41A   Sheffield Darnall on 13/04/1958
40A   Lincoln on 08/06/1958
     Withdrawn on 23/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 17/07/1948
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 40F Boston on 29/10/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/07/1956
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 41A Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 23/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
20/05/1911 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1422)
23/12/1916 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1421)
01/07/1922 Ross Pop
28/06/1924 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1624)
25/12/1926 Side Window Cab Fitted
24/10/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 392)
19/05/1934 Eureka lubricator fitted
19/05/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
30/05/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 557)
30/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
21/08/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 168)
02/07/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 719)
27/04/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 984)
05/09/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 396)
01/01/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 845)
25/05/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 843)
06/03/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 91)
14/07/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22375)
04/09/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22368)
08/07/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22351)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 28/10/1916 23/12/1916 57 days General Boiler number 1421 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1922 01/07/1922 92 days General Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 28/06/1924 106 days General Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5168
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1926 25/12/1926 113 days General Side Window Cab Fitted
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1927 30/04/1927 15 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 31/08/1929 19/10/1929 50 days General    
Gorton Works 09/09/1931 24/10/1931 46 days General Boiler number 392 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1934 19/05/1934 64 days General Eureka lubricator fitted
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1936 30/05/1936 22 days General Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1937 21/08/1937 29 days General Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1938 02/07/1938 36 days General Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1940 27/04/1940 50 days General Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1942 05/09/1942 48 days General Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1943 01/01/1944 33 days General Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1945 10/02/1945 36 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 13/04/1946 25/05/1946 43 days General Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1946 28/09/1946 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 30/11/1946 07/12/1946 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 07/02/1948 06/03/1948 29 days General Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9803
 
Gateshead Works 24/03/1949 29/04/1949 37 days Light Casual Renumbered to BR 69803
 
Darlington Works 22/05/1951 14/07/1951 54 days General Boiler number 22375 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 16/07/1953 04/09/1953 51 days General Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 12/05/1955 08/07/1955 58 days General Boiler number 22351 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 18/07/1955 20/07/1955 3 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 03/10/1955 04/10/1955 2 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 23/06/1959 23/06/1959 1 day No repairs    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/07/1958 Nottingham - Lincoln On 12th July, A5 69803 (40A) was noted on the 2-55 p.m. ex Lincoln and the return working (5.45 p.m. ex Derby). SLS/195808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/05/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 168
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
28/10/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1916. Dep: 23/12/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1421 (Diagram 18)
   
01/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1922. Dep: 01/07/1922.
Work undertaken:
Ross Pop
   
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5168
   
20/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
04/09/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1926. Dep: 25/12/1926.
Work undertaken:
Side Window Cab Fitted
   
16/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927.    
28/07/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
31/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929.    
09/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 392 (Diagram 18)
   
17/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1934. Dep: 19/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Eureka lubricator fitted
   
09/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
24/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18)
   
28/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18)
   
09/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
   
20/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18)
   
30/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1943. Dep: 01/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18)
   
06/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 10/02/1945.    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9803    
13/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18)
   
21/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946.    
30/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946.    
07/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1948. Dep: 06/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9803
   
11/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
17/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
24/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1949. Dep: 29/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 69803
   
10/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
29/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
22/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1951. Dep: 14/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22375 (Diagram 18)
   
16/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1953. Dep: 04/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18)
   
12/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22351 (Diagram 18)
   
18/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/07/1955. Dep: 20/07/1955.    
28/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
03/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 04/10/1955.    
24/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
28/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
13/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
23/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69803 from Lincoln (40A)    
23/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/06/1959. Dep: 23/06/1959.    
07/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev