Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 305 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5916 Week
» 16962 Month
» 16962 Year
» 1682338 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 23 on 24/06/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5023   04/10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9806   27/07/1946
British Railways 69806   05/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Thu 24/06/1911 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Thu 03/03/1960 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping During 05/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 48 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) on 24/06/1911
38A Colwick on 12/02/1950
39A Gorton on 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn on 03/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 18/02/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 19/06/1954
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 05/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/06/1911 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1425)
23/06/1917 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1426)
21/11/1919 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1424)
14/05/1921 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1423)
04/10/1924 Side Window Cab Fitted
11/08/1926 Converted to oil burnng
26/02/1927 Oil burning equipment removed
06/10/1928 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1530)
11/06/1932 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1532)
17/06/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 410)
03/11/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 696)
15/08/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 964)
15/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
19/03/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 278)
06/01/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 986)
18/04/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 210)
06/11/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1825)
23/06/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 983)
21/06/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 718)
05/03/1949 WPU Gear removed
05/03/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3852)
03/03/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22364)
03/10/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22374)
29/11/1956 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22388)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/04/1917 23/06/1917 64 days General
Boiler number 1426 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1919 21/11/1919 35 days General
Boiler number 1424 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1921 14/05/1921 29 days General
Boiler number 1423 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1922 09/12/1922 50 days General  
Gorton Works 12/07/1924 04/10/1924 85 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5023
 
Nine Elms Works 05/08/1926 11/08/1926 7 days Light Repair
Converted to oil burnng
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1926 26/02/1927 78 days General
Oil burning equipment removed
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1928 06/10/1928 57 days General
Boiler number 1530 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1930 02/08/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 14/05/1932 11/06/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1933 17/06/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 410 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1934 03/11/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 696 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1936 15/08/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1938 19/03/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1939 06/01/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 986 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1942 18/04/1942 24 days General
Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1943 06/11/1943 37 days General
Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1945 23/06/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 983 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1946 27/07/1946 29 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9806
 
Gorton Works 17/05/1947 21/06/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1949 05/03/1949 29 days General
Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69806
 
Darlington Works 25/01/1951 03/03/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 22364 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 04/04/1951 06/04/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 05/11/1952 06/12/1952 32 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 04/09/1953 03/10/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 22374 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 14/10/1953 17/10/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/12/1953 21/01/1954 43 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 16/10/1956 29/11/1956 45 days General
Boiler number 22388 (Diagram 18)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/06/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 23
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
12/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
03/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69806 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev