Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 930 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6541 Week
» 17587 Month
» 17587 Year
» 1682963 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 24 on 01/07/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5024   27/06/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9807   11/08/1946
British Railways 69807   06/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 01/07/1911 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 14/07/1958 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 09/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 47 yrs , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) on 01/07/1911
CLK Colwick on 29/01/1950
   Withdrawn on 14/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/02/1950
WDN   on 14/07/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/07/1911 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1426)
19/05/1917 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1699)
07/05/1921 Ross Pop
19/05/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 444)
27/06/1925 Side Window Cab Fitted
06/08/1926 Converted to oil burnng
02/04/1927 Oil burning equipment removed
20/04/1929 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 383)
05/08/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 983)
31/08/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
17/04/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 321)
22/10/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 168)
16/11/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1825)
31/10/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 845)
11/12/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 846)
21/12/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 672)
13/09/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 983)
06/05/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3845)
07/04/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22372)
04/12/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22041)
26/02/1957 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22357)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/03/1917 19/05/1917 64 days General
Boiler number 1699 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1921 07/05/1921 43 days General
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1923 19/05/1923 92 days General
Boiler number 444 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1925 27/06/1925 85 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5024
 
Nine Elms Works 28/07/1926 06/08/1926 10 days Light Repair
Converted to oil burnng
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1927 02/04/1927 71 days General
Oil burning equipment removed
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1927 24/09/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 09/02/1929 20/04/1929 71 days General
Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1930 31/01/1931 32 days General  
Gorton Works 01/07/1933 05/08/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 983 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1933 16/09/1933 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 20/07/1935 31/08/1935 43 days General
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1937 17/04/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 321 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1938 22/10/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1940 16/11/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1942 31/10/1942 36 days General
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1943 11/12/1943 29 days General
Boiler number 846 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1944 28/10/1944 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/11/1945 21/12/1945 35 days General
Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1947 13/09/1947 36 days General
Fitted with GWR ATC
Boiler number 983 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 18/03/1949 06/05/1949 50 days General
GWR ATC removed
Boiler number 3845 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69807
 
Darlington Works 19/02/1951 07/04/1951 48 days General
Boiler number 22372 (Diagram 18)
 
Gateshead Works 03/11/1952 22/11/1952 20 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 02/10/1954 04/12/1954 64 days General
Boiler number 22041 (Diagram 18)
 
Gateshead Works 09/11/1956 23/11/1956 15 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 24/01/1957 26/02/1957 34 days General
Boiler number 22357 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 03/07/1958 03/07/1958 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/07/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 24
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9807    
29/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
14/07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69807 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev