Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1079 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 4468 Week
» 23369 Month
» 23369 Year
» 1688745 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 448 on 12/08/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5448   13/02/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9808   01/06/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E9808   17/01/1948
British Railways 69808   06/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Thu 12/08/1911 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Thu 17/11/1960 off Lincoln (40A)
Scrapping During 11/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 49 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) on 12/08/1911
ARD Ardsley on 05/01/1924
NEA Neasden on 21/04/1924
KX Kings Cross on 22/02/1928
NEA Neasden on 08/01/1930
ARD Ardsley on 16/10/1941
NEA Neasden on 15/02/1943
40B Immingham on 26/03/1950
40F Boston on 06/08/1950
40B Immingham on 19/02/1956
40F Boston on 26/02/1956
40A Lincoln on 01/03/1959
   Withdrawn on 17/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40F Boston w/e 06/08/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 40F Boston 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   on 14/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/08/1911 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1428)
02/02/1918 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1427)
05/01/1922 Ross Pop
09/06/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1683)
13/02/1926 Side Window Cab Fitted
04/01/1930 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1784)
12/12/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1624)
13/01/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 416)
03/08/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 383)
03/08/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
23/01/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 986)
12/03/1938 Trip cock gear fitted
02/12/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 843)
06/12/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3849)
04/03/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 696)
01/06/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 658)
17/01/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3841)
22/03/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22388)
02/10/1956 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22362)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/11/1917 02/02/1918 78 days General
Boiler number 1427 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1921 29/10/1921 57 days General  
Gorton Works 05/01/1922 05/01/1922 1 day Light Repair
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1923 09/06/1923 99 days General
Boiler number 1683 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1925 13/02/1926 78 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5448
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1927 11/02/1928 78 days General  
Gorton Works 16/11/1929 04/01/1930 50 days General
Boiler number 1784 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1931 12/12/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1933 13/01/1934 43 days General
Boiler number 416 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1935 03/08/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 26/12/1936 23/01/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 986 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1938 12/03/1938 36 days General
Trip cock gear fitted
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 02/12/1939 36 days General
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1941 06/12/1941 52 days General
Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1942 11/04/1942 31 days Light Repair
Collision damage
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1944 04/03/1944 37 days General
Boiler number 696 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1944 21/10/1944 19 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/04/1946 01/06/1946 50 days General
Boiler number 658 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9808
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1947 17/01/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9808
 
Darlington Works 22/06/1949 06/12/1949 168 days General
Renumbered to BR 69808
 
Darlington Works 03/03/1952 22/03/1952 20 days General
Boiler number 22388 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 24/03/1952 26/03/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/05/1954 26/06/1954 43 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 27/06/1954 05/07/1954 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/08/1956 02/10/1956 40 days General
Boiler number 22362 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 17/11/1960 17/11/1960 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/04/1959 Branch Lines The following have been approved for closure by the T.U.C.C. and it is expected that some of the passenger services thereon will lapse with the end of Winter t.t.- Kettering to Cambridge (as far as St. Ives), Penistone-Barnsley-Mexborough, South-well branch, Stamford-Essendine, Wallingford branch and Wellingborough-Higham Ferrers; in connection with the Barnsley (C.H.) branch, note that the 1-25 a.m. Manchester (L. Rd.)-Doncaster is still to travel this way calling at Barnsley. The T.U.C.C. have not approved the closure of the Grimsby and Immingham Ty. or the local stations between Sheffield and Penistone; C.I.E. is to close the former G.N.R. (I) Hill of Howth Ty. as from 1st June.
In connection with the quotations which the Press made from the N.U.R. Review of the list of branches 'under consideration' on the L.M.R., it should be noted that the operative word is 'consideration.' Any concrete proposals have to be submitted to the T.U.C.C. concerned, together with the alternative facilities arranged. It is understood that the Churnet Valley, Northampton-Bedford and Bedford-Hitchin branches are to be submitted to the T.U.C.C. for closure together with the local stations between Northampton and Rugby and Roade station. On the W.R., it is understood that it is proposed to withdraw the passenger services from Hartlebury and Kidderminster to Bridgnorth and between Bewdley and Woofferton if the B.T.C. Parliamentary bill is approved.
During the early part of May A5 69808 worked the Southwell branch whilst 58065 was under repair. During May, the Penistone-Barnsley branch was worked by J11s or 67445 (C14); the other C14 (67448) was out of use at Mexborough shed. It is expected that this will be the last sununer that it will be possible to travel by passenger train between Tebay or Penrith and Barnard Castle (goods traffic has already been diverted); the last summer too that it will be possible to travel by steam train on the Oban and Fort William branches. Locomotive Information H.R. 103 is at present in St. Rollox Works undergoing heavy repair. N.B.R. Glen Douglas is in Cowlairs Works being ' restored ' and work on the M.R. Compound proceeds at Derby-on 22nd May the number 1000 was affixed to the smokebox (see Derby Works list).
SLS/195906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/08/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 448
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
05/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
21/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
22/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
08/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
16/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
15/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
26/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
19/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
26/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
01/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
17/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69808 from Lincoln (40A)    

prev prev