Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 172 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3561 Week
» 22462 Month
» 22462 Year
» 1687838 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 449 on 19/10/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5449   26/01/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9809   18/08/1946
British Railways 69809   25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 19/10/1912 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Mon 04/05/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 05/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 46 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) on 19/10/1912
NEA Neasden on 22/04/1924
WFD Woodford Halse on 03/10/1938
NEA Neasden on 03/12/1938
WFD Woodford Halse on 25/06/1939
CLK Colwick on 31/07/1939
NEA Neasden on 09/09/1941
BOS Boston on 30/01/1949
CLK Colwick on 11/12/1949
38B Annesley on 07/10/1956
40E Colwick on 14/12/1958
   Withdrawn on 04/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 05/02/1949
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 13/10/1956
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
LOAN 40E Colwick 4w/e 27/12/1958
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   on 04/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
19/10/1912 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1529)
08/05/1920 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1534)
12/06/1926 Side Window Cab Fitted
04/02/1928 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1825)
02/07/1932 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1530)
21/07/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 278)
25/07/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 325)
25/07/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
11/12/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 947)
06/04/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 210)
31/01/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 843)
20/11/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 91)
26/01/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 718)
05/04/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 936)
25/09/1948 WPU Gear removed
25/09/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3856)
10/03/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22368)
06/06/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22399)
20/03/1956 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22047)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/02/1920 08/05/1920 92 days General
Boiler number 1534 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1922 12/03/1922 1 day Light Repair
R0ss Pops fitted
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1922 16/12/1922 29 days General  
Gorton Works 27/10/1923 26/01/1924 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5449
 
Gorton Works 06/03/1926 12/06/1926 99 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1927 04/02/1928 57 days General
Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1930 26/07/1930 57 days General  
Gorton Works 04/06/1932 02/07/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 1530 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1934 21/07/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1936 25/07/1936 43 days General
Boiler number 325 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1937 11/12/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1940 06/04/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1942 31/01/1942 25 days General
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1943 20/11/1943 36 days General
Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1944 02/09/1944 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/12/1945 26/01/1946 29 days General
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1947 05/04/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 936 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1948 25/09/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3856 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69809
 
Darlington Works 05/06/1950 10/08/1950 67 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 10/02/1951 10/03/1951 29 days General
Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 02/04/1951 14/04/1951 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/05/1953 06/06/1953 27 days General
Boiler number 22399 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 08/06/1953 09/06/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/06/1953 19/06/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 06/11/1954 27/11/1954 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 30/11/1954 03/12/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/02/1956 20/03/1956 30 days General
Boiler number 22047 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 01/05/1959 01/05/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/10/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 449
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
22/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
03/10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/12/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
25/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
31/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9809    
30/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
11/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
14/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
04/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69809 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev