|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/02/1920 | 08/05/1920 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1534 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1922 | 12/03/1922 | 1 day | Light Repair | R0ss Pops fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1922 | 16/12/1922 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1923 | 26/01/1924 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5449 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1926 | 12/06/1926 | 99 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1927 | 04/02/1928 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1930 | 26/07/1930 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1932 | 02/07/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1530 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1934 | 21/07/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1936 | 25/07/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 325 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1937 | 11/12/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1940 | 06/04/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1942 | 31/01/1942 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1945 | 26/01/1946 | 29 days | General | New frames & cylinders Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1947 | 05/04/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 936 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1948 | 25/09/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3856 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69809 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1950 | 10/08/1950 | 67 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1951 | 10/03/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1951 | 14/04/1951 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1953 | 06/06/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22399 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1953 | 09/06/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1953 | 19/06/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1954 | 27/11/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1954 | 03/12/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1956 | 20/03/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22047 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1959 | 01/05/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/10/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 449 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1920. Dep: 08/05/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1534 (Diagram 18) |
||
12/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/03/1922. Dep: 12/03/1922. Work undertaken: R0ss Pops fitted |
||
18/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1922. Dep: 16/12/1922. | ||
27/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1923. Dep: 26/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5449 |
||
22/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
06/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1926. Dep: 12/06/1926. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted |
||
10/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1927. Dep: 04/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18) |
||
31/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930. | ||
04/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1932. Dep: 02/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1530 (Diagram 18) |
||
30/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 325 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
20/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) |
||
03/10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
03/12/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
25/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
31/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
02/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/09/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
07/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1942. Dep: 31/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18) |
||
19/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. | ||
29/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1945. Dep: 26/01/1946. Work undertaken: New frames & cylinders Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9809 | ||
08/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 936 (Diagram 18) |
||
28/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1948. Dep: 25/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3856 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69809 |
||
30/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
05/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
11/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
05/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1950. Dep: 10/08/1950. | ||
10/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1951. Dep: 10/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18) |
||
02/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951. | ||
11/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22399 (Diagram 18) |
||
08/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1953. Dep: 09/06/1953. | ||
18/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1953. Dep: 19/06/1953. | ||
06/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/11/1954. Dep: 27/11/1954. | ||
30/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1954. Dep: 03/12/1954. | ||
20/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1956. Dep: 20/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22047 (Diagram 18) |
||
07/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
14/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
05/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
01/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/05/1959. Dep: 01/05/1959. | ||
04/05/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69809 from Colwick (40E) |