Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 922 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 922 Week
» 19823 Month
» 19823 Year
» 1685199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 451 on 16/11/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5451   13/12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9811   18/08/1946
British Railways 69811   24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 16/11/1912 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 06/10/1958 off Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)
Scrapping During 10/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 45 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) on 16/11/1912
ARD Ardsley on 11/02/1926
NEA Neasden on 13/01/1927
51K Saltburn on 04/06/1950
53B Hull Botanic Gardens on 19/08/1951
   Withdrawn on 06/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51K Saltburn on 04/06/1950
ALLOC 51K Saltburn m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 40F Boston w/e 06/08/1950
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 25/08/1951
WDN   on 06/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/11/1912 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1531)
27/12/1919 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1826)
27/11/1926 Side Window Cab Fitted
27/11/1926 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 720)
21/02/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 149)
19/11/1932 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 844)
23/06/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1683)
25/04/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 343)
08/01/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 325)
26/08/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3849)
29/11/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 392)
27/01/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 708)
16/11/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3861)
24/04/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 658)
17/02/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3858)
12/07/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22393)
15/01/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22044)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/11/1919 27/12/1919 36 days General
Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1922 18/11/1922 57 days General  
Gorton Works 13/09/1924 13/12/1924 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5451
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1926 27/11/1926 102 days General
Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18)
Side Window Cab Fitted
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1928 10/11/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 03/01/1931 21/02/1931 50 days General
Boiler number 149 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1932 19/11/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1934 23/06/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 1683 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1936 25/04/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 343 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1937 08/01/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 325 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1939 26/08/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1941 29/11/1941 34 days General
Boiler number 392 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1943 29/05/1943 68 days General  
Gorton Works 06/01/1945 27/01/1945 22 days General
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 708 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1946 16/11/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3861 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1948 24/04/1948 43 days General
Boiler number 658 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69811
 
Darlington Works 09/01/1950 17/02/1950 40 days General
Boiler number 3858 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 27/02/1950 08/03/1950 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/06/1952 12/07/1952 27 days General
Boiler number 22393 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1954 15/01/1955 64 days General
Boiler number 22044 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 22/10/1956 22/11/1956 32 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/11/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 451
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
11/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
13/01/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9811    
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (51K)    
19/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
06/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69811 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    

prev prev