Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 265 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2534 Week
» 21435 Month
» 21435 Year
» 1686811 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 452 on 30/11/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 452C   29/09/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5452   30/01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9812   18/08/1946
British Railways 69812   11/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Tue 30/11/1912 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Tue 07/07/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 09/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 46 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) on 30/11/1912
WFD Woodford Halse on 20/09/1924
NEA Neasden on 23/09/1924
GOR Gorton on 21/12/1927
KX Kings Cross on 30/06/1928
HIT Hither Green on 29/11/1935
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street on 06/05/1937
NEA Neasden on 16/10/1937
? London Transport Passenger Board on 01/11/1937
NEA Neasden on 02/10/1938
GRA Grantham on 14/05/1948
LNG Langwith Junction on 23/01/1949
40A Lincoln on 24/10/1954
40B Immingham on 13/02/1955
40F Boston on 11/03/1956
38A Colwick on 29/07/1956
   Withdrawn on 07/07/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 40F Boston 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 18/08/1956
WDN   on 07/07/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/11/1912 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1532)
01/12/1917 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1419)
09/04/1922 Ross Pop
25/08/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 414)
30/01/1926 Side Window Cab Fitted
15/11/1930 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 558)
11/08/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1825)
11/08/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
16/10/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 718)
16/10/1937 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
30/10/1937 Trip cock gear fitted
09/12/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 846)
11/12/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 720)
30/03/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 149)
11/01/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3849)
29/12/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22383)
18/09/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22382)
12/10/1957 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22043)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/10/1917 01/12/1917 43 days General
Boiler number 1419 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1921 04/02/1922 99 days General  
Gorton Works 09/04/1922 09/04/1922 1 day Light Repair
Ross Pop
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1923 25/08/1923 148 days General
Boiler number 414 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1925 30/01/1926 71 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5452
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1928 16/06/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 11/10/1930 15/11/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1934 11/08/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1937 16/10/1937 43 days General
Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1937 30/10/1937 1 day Light Repair
Trip cock gear fitted
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1939 09/12/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 846 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1941 24/01/1942 40 days General  
Gorton Works 18/10/1943 11/12/1943 55 days General
Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1944 07/10/1944 11 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 10/02/1945 03/03/1945 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 23/02/1946 30/03/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 149 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1947 25/10/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 30/11/1949 11/01/1950 43 days General
Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69812
 
Darlington Works 07/06/1950 08/07/1950 32 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 23/11/1951 29/12/1951 37 days General
Boiler number 22383 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 01/01/1952 04/01/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/10/1952 25/10/1952 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 10/07/1954 18/09/1954 71 days General
Boiler number 22382 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 04/09/1957 12/10/1957 39 days General
Boiler number 22043 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 19/10/1957 20/10/1957 2 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1912 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 452
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
29/09/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 452C    
20/09/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
23/09/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
21/12/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
29/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT)    
06/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
16/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
01/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to London Transport Passenger Board (?)    
02/10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9812    
14/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
23/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
13/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
29/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
07/07/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69812 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev