|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/02/1920 | 28/02/1920 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1921 | 28/01/1922 | 85 days | General | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1923 | 16/02/1924 | 106 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5129 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1925 | 13/02/1926 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1928 | 28/04/1928 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1533 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1929 | 09/11/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1931 | 14/11/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1934 | 24/03/1934 | 50 days | General | Eureka lubricator fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1935 | 07/12/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 939 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1936 | 04/07/1936 | 22 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 816 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1939 | 01/04/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1941 | 24/05/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 772 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1943 | 11/09/1943 | 53 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1945 | 09/06/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3859 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1948 | 24/07/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69814 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 11 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1950 | 06/09/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 22350 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1950 | 14/09/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1951 | 05/09/1951 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1952 | 26/09/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22351 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1952 | 07/10/1952 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1955 | 11/03/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22360 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1958 | 21/03/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22383 (Diagram 18) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/12/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 129 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
07/02/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1920. Dep: 28/02/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18) |
||
05/11/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1921. Dep: 28/01/1922. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
03/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1923. Dep: 16/02/1924. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5129 |
||
25/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
21/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
20/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
28/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926. | ||
11/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1533 (Diagram 18) |
||
07/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
28/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929. | ||
18/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
03/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18) |
||
03/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934. Work undertaken: Eureka lubricator fitted |
||
16/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1935. Dep: 07/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 939 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
13/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936. | ||
28/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 816 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 01/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18) |
||
19/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 772 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1943. Dep: 11/09/1943. | ||
28/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18) |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9814 | ||
14/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3859 (Diagram 18) |
||
12/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1948. Dep: 24/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69814 |
||
08/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. | ||
30/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
31/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1950. Dep: 06/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22350 (Diagram 18) |
||
12/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1950. Dep: 14/09/1950. | ||
29/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
05/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
08/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1951. Dep: 05/09/1951. | ||
20/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1952. Dep: 26/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22351 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1952. Dep: 07/10/1952. | ||
16/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
09/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1955. Dep: 11/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22360 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955. | ||
18/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22383 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
19/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
11/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
14/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69814 from Colwick (40E) |