|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/10/1922 | 03/02/1923 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1924 | 21/02/1925 | 92 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5411 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1926 | 15/01/1927 | 92 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1928 | 27/10/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1534 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1930 | 14/02/1931 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1933 | 14/10/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1936 | 22/02/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1937 | 22/05/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1937 | 25/11/1937 | 4 days | Light Repair | Trip cock gear fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1939 | 22/07/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1941 | 13/12/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9819 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1947 | 20/12/1947 | 22 days | General | New frames & cylinders Boiler number 3868 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1949 | 02/09/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69819 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1951 | 08/12/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22384 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22381 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1957 | 06/07/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22041 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1957 | 19/07/1957 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1957 | 28/07/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1958 | 05/02/1958 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/10/1917 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 411 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
21/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1922. Dep: 03/02/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1924. Dep: 21/02/1925. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5411 |
||
16/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927. | ||
15/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1928. Dep: 27/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1534 (Diagram 18) |
||
31/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1930. Dep: 14/02/1931. | ||
16/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1936. Dep: 22/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
17/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1937. Dep: 22/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
12/11/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
14/11/1937 | Allocation | |||
22/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/11/1937. Dep: 25/11/1937. Work undertaken: Trip cock gear fitted |
||
17/04/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
24/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
01/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
03/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18) |
||
30/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9819 |
||
29/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947. Work undertaken: New frames & cylinders Boiler number 3868 (Diagram 18) |
||
03/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69819 |
||
26/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
06/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
12/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22384 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22381 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
04/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22041 (Diagram 18) |
||
14/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1957. Dep: 19/07/1957. | ||
24/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/07/1957. Dep: 28/07/1957. | ||
05/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/02/1958. Dep: 05/02/1958. | ||
03/03/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69819 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
04/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |