Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 174 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3563 Week
» 22464 Month
» 22464 Year
» 1687840 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6 on 10/02/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5006   30/05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9821   21/07/1946
British Railways 69821   05/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Thu 10/02/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Thu 19/05/1960 off Lincoln (40A)
Scrapping During 06/1960 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)
Service Life 37 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) on 10/02/1923
ARD Ardsley on 16/10/1941
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street on 13/12/1941
ARD Ardsley on 15/03/1942
NEA Neasden on 15/02/1943
38A Colwick on 26/03/1950
40E Langwith Junction on 04/02/1951
40F Boston on 10/02/1952
40E Langwith Junction on 20/04/1952
40A Lincoln on 24/10/1954
40B Immingham on 13/02/1955
40E Langwith Junction on 10/07/1955
38A Colwick on 23/10/1955
40B Immingham on 17/02/1957
40A Lincoln on 16/06/1957
   Withdrawn on 19/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 04/02/1951
ALLOC 40F Boston 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 19/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/02/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 386)
08/12/1928 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1843)
24/03/1932 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 714)
24/02/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1644)
24/02/1934 Eureka lubricator fitted
24/02/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
29/08/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
16/04/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 558)
22/11/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 557)
20/11/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3858)
28/07/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 783)
01/03/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 806)
05/02/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 800)
05/02/1949 WPU Gear removed
30/12/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22357)
03/10/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22375)
30/08/1956 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22049)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/03/1925 30/05/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5006
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1927 28/05/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 27/10/1928 08/12/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1930 05/07/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 26/03/1932 23/04/1932 29 days General  
Gorton Works 20/01/1934 24/02/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 1644 (Diagram 18)
Eureka lubricator fitted
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1936 29/08/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1938 16/04/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1940 16/03/1940 36 days General  
Gorton Works 07/10/1941 22/11/1941 47 days General
Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1943 20/11/1943 34 days General
Boiler number 3858 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1944 05/08/1944 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 09/06/1945 28/07/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 783 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1947 01/03/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1947 18/10/1947 15 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1948 05/02/1949 50 days General
Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69821
 
Darlington Works 16/11/1950 30/12/1950 45 days General
Boiler number 22357 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 02/01/1951 20/01/1951 19 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/12/1952 14/02/1953 55 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 17/02/1953 08/03/1953 20 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/08/1953 03/10/1953 41 days General
Boiler number 22375 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 06/10/1953 26/10/1953 21 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/07/1956 30/08/1956 52 days General
Boiler number 22049 (Diagram 18)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/02/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
24/03/1932 Modification Diagram 18 number 714 boiler fitted    
16/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
13/12/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
15/03/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
15/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
21/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9821    
26/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
04/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
10/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
20/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
24/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
13/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
10/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
23/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
19/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69821 from Lincoln (40A)    

prev prev