|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/03/1925 | 30/05/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5006 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1927 | 28/05/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1928 | 08/12/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1930 | 05/07/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1932 | 23/04/1932 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1934 | 24/02/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1644 (Diagram 18) Eureka lubricator fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1936 | 29/08/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1938 | 16/04/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1940 | 16/03/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1941 | 22/11/1941 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3858 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 783 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1947 | 01/03/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1947 | 18/10/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1948 | 05/02/1949 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69821 |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1950 | 30/12/1950 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22357 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1951 | 20/01/1951 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1952 | 14/02/1953 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1953 | 08/03/1953 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1953 | 03/10/1953 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 22375 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1953 | 26/10/1953 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1956 | 30/08/1956 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 22049 (Diagram 18) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/02/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 6 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
21/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1925. Dep: 30/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5006 |
||
02/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1927. Dep: 28/05/1927. | ||
27/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1928. Dep: 08/12/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18) |
||
31/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1930. Dep: 05/07/1930. | ||
24/03/1932 | Modification | Diagram 18 number 714 boiler fitted | ||
26/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932. | ||
20/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1644 (Diagram 18) Eureka lubricator fitted |
||
08/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
26/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 16/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18) |
||
10/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1940. Dep: 16/03/1940. | ||
07/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1941. Dep: 22/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
13/12/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
15/03/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
15/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
18/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3858 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. | ||
09/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 783 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9821 | ||
18/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/10/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
18/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1948. Dep: 05/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69821 |
||
26/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
16/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1950. Dep: 30/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22357 (Diagram 18) |
||
02/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1951. Dep: 20/01/1951. | ||
04/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
10/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
20/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
22/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1952. Dep: 14/02/1953. | ||
17/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1953. Dep: 08/03/1953. | ||
24/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22375 (Diagram 18) |
||
06/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1953. Dep: 26/10/1953. | ||
24/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
13/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
23/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
10/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1956. Dep: 30/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22049 (Diagram 18) |
||
17/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
19/05/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69821 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
06/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford |