Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 43 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4762 Week
» 15907 Month
» 115692 Year
» 1781068 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 45 on 07/04/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5045   30/05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9824   21/07/1946
British Railways 69824   13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Tue 07/04/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Tue 16/12/1958 off Lincoln (40A)
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
NEA   Neasden (New) on 07/04/1923
ARD   Ardsley on 29/04/1927
NEA   Neasden on 16/06/1927
BOS   Boston on 30/01/1949
BOS   Boston w/e 05/02/1949
LIN   Lincoln on 13/02/1949
LIN   Lincoln w/e 19/02/1949
GRA   Grantham on 11/09/1949
GRA   Grantham w/e 17/09/1949
40F   Boston on 15/10/1950
40F   Boston w/e 16/10/1950
40A   Lincoln on 27/05/1951
40A   Lincoln w/e 02/06/1951
32A   Norwich Thorpe on 11/05/1952
32A   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 17/05/1952
32C   Lowestoft on 30/10/1955
40B   Immingham on 17/02/1957
34F   Grantham on 13/04/1958
40A   Lincoln on 08/06/1958
     Withdrawn on 16/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 05/02/1949
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 40F Boston w/e 16/10/1950
ALLOC 40A Lincoln w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 34F Grantham 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 16/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/04/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 392)
15/06/1929 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 86)
25/07/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1597)
05/08/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1826)
04/05/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
04/05/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 704)
12/03/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 720)
06/04/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 278)
15/08/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 947)
13/11/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3859)
11/08/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 171)
10/05/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3848)
13/11/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 210)
13/11/1948 WPU Gear removed
26/08/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3861)
02/05/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22390)
21/09/1957 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22399)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 21/03/1925 30/05/1925 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5045
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1927 27/08/1927 64 days General    
Gorton Works 06/04/1929 15/06/1929 71 days General Boiler number 86 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1931 25/07/1931 43 days General Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1933 05/08/1933 29 days General Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1935 04/05/1935 29 days General Boiler number 704 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1936 08/08/1936 29 days General    
Gorton Works 12/02/1938 12/03/1938 29 days General Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 02/03/1940 06/04/1940 36 days General Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1942 15/08/1942 27 days General Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1943 13/11/1943 27 days General Boiler number 3859 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1944 26/02/1944 23 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1945 11/08/1945 43 days General New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 171 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1947 10/05/1947 43 days General Boiler number 3848 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1948 13/11/1948 22 days General Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69824
 
Darlington Works 09/05/1949 16/07/1949 69 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 16/08/1950 26/08/1950 11 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 3861 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 29/03/1952 02/05/1952 35 days General Part 2 built-up chimney fitted
Boiler number 22390 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1954 13/11/1954 50 days Heavy Intermediate    
Darlington Works 20/08/1957 21/09/1957 33 days General Boiler number 22399 (Diagram 18)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/04/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 45
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
21/03/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1925. Dep: 30/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5045
   
29/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
16/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
25/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927.    
06/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1929. Dep: 15/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 86 (Diagram 18)
   
13/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1931. Dep: 25/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18)
   
08/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18)
   
06/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 704 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
11/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936.    
12/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18)
   
02/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18)
   
20/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18)
   
18/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3859 (Diagram 18)
   
04/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/02/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
30/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1945. Dep: 11/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 171 (Diagram 18)
   
21/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9824    
29/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3848 (Diagram 18)
   
23/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69824
   
30/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
05/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
13/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
19/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
09/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1949. Dep: 16/07/1949.    
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
16/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3861 (Diagram 18)
   
15/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
16/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
27/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
02/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
29/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1952. Dep: 02/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Part 2 built-up chimney fitted
Boiler number 22390 (Diagram 18)
   
11/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
25/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/09/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954.    
30/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22399 (Diagram 18)
   
13/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
16/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69824 from Lincoln (40A)    
01/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev