|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/04/1925 | 20/06/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5046 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1927 | 01/10/1927 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1928 | 11/02/1928 | 22 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1929 | 08/06/1929 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1931 | 27/06/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1933 | 27/05/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1935 | 06/04/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1936 | 03/10/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1938 | 05/03/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1795 (Diagram 18) Trip cock gear fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1939 | 18/11/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1941 | 26/07/1941 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 714 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1943 | 09/10/1943 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 174 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 772 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1947 | 16/08/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 18) Hudd ATC fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 25/12/1948 | 29/01/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69825 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1951 | 26/05/1951 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22367 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1951 | 07/06/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1952 | 04/10/1952 | 24 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1953 | 22/12/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22373 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1955 | 02/12/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1956 | 09/07/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 22048 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1959 | 26/11/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/04/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 46 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
11/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5046 |
||
29/04/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
30/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1927. Dep: 01/10/1927. | ||
21/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1928. Dep: 11/02/1928. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
23/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18) |
||
29/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 27/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
05/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18) |
||
12/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1795 (Diagram 18) Trip cock gear fitted |
||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18) |
||
28/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 714 (Diagram 18) |
||
26/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 174 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 772 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9825 | ||
28/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 18) Hudd ATC fitted |
||
25/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1948. Dep: 29/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69825 |
||
21/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. | ||
05/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22367 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1951. Dep: 07/06/1951. | ||
11/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952. | ||
21/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1953. Dep: 22/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22373 (Diagram 18) |
||
29/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/11/1955. Dep: 02/12/1955. | ||
31/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1956. Dep: 09/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22048 (Diagram 18) |
||
14/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
14/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
26/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/11/1959. Dep: 26/11/1959. | ||
30/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69825 from Colwick (40E) | ||
12/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |