Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 152 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3541 Week
» 22442 Month
» 22442 Year
» 1687818 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 88 on 12/05/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5088   13/06/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9826 on 24/03/1946
British Railways 69826   15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 12/05/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 02/06/1958 off Immingham (40B)
Scrapping During 07/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 35 yrs , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) on 12/05/1923
38A Colwick on 19/03/1950
51A Darlington on 04/02/1951
38A Colwick on 26/08/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe on 25/05/1952
32C Lowestoft on 29/01/1956
40B Immingham on 17/02/1957
   Withdrawn on 02/06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51A Darlington on 04/02/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington w/e 04/02/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick on 26/08/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   on 02/06/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/05/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 396)
20/07/1929 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1694)
28/10/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 390)
18/01/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 168)
18/01/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/01/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
07/08/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1905)
18/02/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 390)
12/04/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 410)
29/07/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3856)
10/08/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 984)
15/05/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3846)
12/08/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 714)
19/04/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22370)
15/05/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22376)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/04/1925 13/06/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5088
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1927 13/08/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 13/04/1929 20/07/1929 99 days General
Boiler number 1694 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1931 06/06/1931 29 days General  
Gorton Works 07/10/1933 28/10/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1935 18/01/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1937 07/08/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 1905 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1939 18/02/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1941 12/04/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 410 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1942 20/06/1942 60 days General  
Gorton Works 17/06/1944 29/07/1944 43 days General
Boiler number 3856 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1946 10/08/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1947 17/05/1947 29 days General  
Gorton Works 13/03/1948 15/05/1948 64 days General
Boiler number 3846 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69826
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1948 28/08/1948 17 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 27/06/1949 12/08/1949 47 days General
Boiler number 714 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 12/03/1951 19/04/1951 39 days General
Boiler number 22370 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 30/04/1951 01/05/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/04/1952 07/05/1952 36 days Light Casual
Part 2 built up chimney fitted
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1954 15/05/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 22376 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1954 27/05/1954 10 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 03/06/1954 19/06/1954 17 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/02/1955 18/03/1955 23 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/05/1958 21/05/1958 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/05/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 88
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9826    
19/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
04/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
26/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69826 from Immingham (40B)    

prev prev