Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 9 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4481 Week
» 23382 Month
» 23382 Year
» 1688758 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 154 on 26/05/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5154   14/11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9827 on 27/01/1946
British Railways 69827   10/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 26/05/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 02/11/1959 off Grantham (34F)
Scrapping During 11/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 36 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) on 26/05/1923
35B Grantham on 16/05/1954
   Withdrawn on 02/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 22/05/1954
WDN   on 02/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/05/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 410)
10/08/1929 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 444)
20/06/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 658)
09/02/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
09/02/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
09/02/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 800)
21/11/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 411)
16/07/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 291)
07/11/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3856)
24/06/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3850)
10/08/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3854)
10/04/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3851)
15/05/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22391)
27/11/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22042)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/08/1925 14/11/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5154
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1927 19/11/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 15/06/1929 10/08/1929 57 days General
Boiler number 444 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1931 20/06/1931 43 days General
Boiler number 658 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1933 25/03/1933 29 days General  
Gorton Works 19/01/1935 09/02/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1936 21/11/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 411 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1938 16/07/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 291 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1940 27/07/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1942 07/11/1942 39 days General
Boiler number 3856 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1944 24/06/1944 57 days General
Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1945 28/04/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 08/06/1946 10/08/1946 64 days General
Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1947 04/10/1947 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/03/1948 10/04/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3851 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69827
 
Darlington Works 07/02/1949 04/03/1949 26 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 25/11/1949 11/04/1950 138 days General
Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 10/07/1950 16/09/1950 69 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 08/04/1952 15/05/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 22391 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1954 20/02/1954 29 days C/I-I  
Gorton Works 23/02/1954 26/02/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/10/1954 27/11/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 22042 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1954 06/12/1954 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/11/1956 14/12/1956 31 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 17/12/1956 18/12/1956 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/11/1959 02/11/1959 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/05/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 154
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9827    
16/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
02/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69827 from Grantham (34F)    

prev prev