Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 297 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5908 Week
» 16954 Month
» 16954 Year
» 1682330 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 158 on 30/06/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 158C   20/06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5158   19/09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9829 on 27/01/1946
British Railways 69829   18/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 30/06/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 30/05/1960 off Immingham (40B)
Scrapping During 06/1960 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)
Service Life 36 yrs , 11 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) on 30/06/1923
39A Gorton on 13/06/1954
32A Norwich Thorpe on 11/09/1955
32C Lowestoft on 08/01/1956
40B Immingham on 17/02/1957
   Withdrawn on 30/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   on 30/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/06/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 416)
23/03/1929 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 390)
30/09/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 383)
04/05/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1826)
04/05/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
04/05/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
30/01/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 383)
04/06/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 984)
06/04/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 947)
04/07/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 156)
21/04/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 800)
08/02/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3853)
18/09/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3866)
18/09/1948 WPU Gear removed
15/04/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3869)
23/05/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22386)
12/06/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22384)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/06/1925 19/09/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5158
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1927 06/08/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 02/02/1929 23/03/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1931 04/04/1931 36 days General  
Gorton Works 16/09/1933 30/09/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1935 04/05/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1936 30/01/1937 31 days General
Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1938 04/06/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1940 06/04/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1942 04/07/1942 41 days General
Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1943 20/11/1943 39 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 29/07/1944 12/08/1944 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 10/03/1945 21/04/1945 43 days General
Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1946 08/02/1947 43 days General
Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1948 18/09/1948 43 days General
Boiler number 3866 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69829
 
Darlington Works 06/02/1950 15/04/1950 69 days General
Boiler number 3869 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 16/04/1951 12/05/1951 27 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 18/04/1952 23/05/1952 36 days General
Part 2 built up chimney fitted
Boiler number 22386 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1954 12/06/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 22384 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1954 28/06/1954 14 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/11/1954 02/11/1954 2 days Weighing  
Gorton Works 09/02/1955 12/02/1955 4 days Weighing  
Darlington Works 16/08/1956 04/10/1956 50 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/06/1923 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 158
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
20/06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 158C    
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9829    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
11/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
08/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
30/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69829 from Immingham (40B)    

prev prev