Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 903 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6399 Week
» 25300 Month
» 25300 Year
» 1690676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1712 on 25/09/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9830   25/05/1946
British Railways 69830   07/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
Works Number 3616
To Service Tue 25/09/1925 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Tue 18/11/1958 off Thornaby (51L)
Scrapping During 11/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) on 25/09/1925
GHD Gateshead on 22/10/1925
HTN Heaton on 21/08/1929
MID Middlesbrough on 31/08/1938
DAR Darlington on 20/03/1939
30A Stratford on 08/04/1951
51A Darlington on 20/05/1951
51E Stockton on 13/06/1954
51A Darlington on 19/09/1954
51C West Hartlepool on 15/09/1957
51K Saltburn on 10/11/1957
51D Middlesbrough on 02/02/1958
51L Thornaby on 01/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 18/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 51K Saltburn 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
WDN   on 18/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/10/1933 Steam Brake fitted
05/10/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 152)
05/10/1933 Westinghouse Brake removed
14/05/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3621)
25/05/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3617)
07/05/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3864)
14/10/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3857)
08/09/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22374)
22/08/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22371)
11/08/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22392)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 27/10/1925 04/11/1925 9 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 01/06/1926 02/06/1926 2 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 17/09/1927 23/01/1928 129 days General  
Gateshead Works 19/02/1930 11/04/1930 52 days General  
Darlington Works 29/08/1933 05/10/1933 38 days General
Boiler number 152 (Diagram 18)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 14/07/1936 10/09/1936 59 days General  
Darlington Works 31/05/1937 11/06/1937 12 days Unclassified
Special bunker fitted
 
Darlington Works 23/01/1939 08/03/1939 45 days General
Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 07/04/1941 14/05/1941 38 days General
Boiler number 3621 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 25/01/1943 02/02/1943 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/04/1943 07/05/1943 31 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/10/1943 22/01/1944 107 days General
Two new 1⅛" part frames
Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 01/05/1946 25/05/1946 25 days General
Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9830
 
Darlington Works 16/08/1946 16/08/1946 1 day Weighing  
Gateshead Works 29/04/1947 22/05/1947 24 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 18/02/1948 07/05/1948 80 days General
Boiler number 3864 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69830
 
Darlington Works 06/09/1949 14/10/1949 39 days General
Boiler number 22366 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 17/01/1951 10/02/1951 25 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/08/1951 08/09/1951 33 days General
Boiler number 22374 (Diagram 18)
 
Gateshead Works 29/01/1952 06/03/1952 38 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 08/01/1953 17/01/1953 10 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 11/07/1953 22/08/1953 43 days General
Boiler number 22371 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 11/07/1955 11/08/1955 32 days General
Boiler number 22392 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 28/12/1956 07/02/1957 42 days Heavy Intermediate  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/04/1958 Saltburn MPD The allocation of this shed (transferred to Middlesbrough 3rd Feb.) are in store here, viz.: 69830/1/3/42/66/9. SLS/195805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/09/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1712
Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3616
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
22/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
21/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
31/08/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
20/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
19/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
10/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (51K)    
02/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
01/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
18/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69830 from Thornaby (51L)    

prev prev