Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 928 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2100 Week
» 21001 Month
» 21001 Year
» 1686377 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1750 on 31/10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9833   07/07/1946
British Railways 69833   04/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
Works Number 3619
To Service Mon 31/10/1925 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 27/05/1957 off Darlington (51A)
Scrapping During 06/1957 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 31 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) on 31/10/1925
HTN Heaton on 21/08/1929
MID Middlesbrough on 24/08/1938
DAR Darlington on 20/03/1939
30A Stratford on 08/04/1951
51A Darlington on 13/05/1951
   Withdrawn on 27/05/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington w/e 19/05/1951
WDN   on 27/05/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
31/10/1925 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3619)
24/11/1933 Steam Brake fitted
24/11/1933 Westinghouse Brake removed
13/06/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3619)
29/11/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3628)
11/01/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3627)
04/12/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3617)
11/05/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3865)
04/06/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3628)
06/05/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3872)
02/11/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22380)
15/08/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22358)
17/09/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22354)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 26/05/1926 27/05/1926 2 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 20/07/1928 28/09/1928 71 days General  
Gateshead Works 01/05/1930 17/06/1930 48 days General  
Gateshead Works 17/08/1931 18/09/1931 33 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 19/10/1933 24/11/1933 37 days General
Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 29/04/1936 13/06/1936 46 days General
Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 24/10/1938 29/11/1938 37 days General
Boiler number 3628 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 29/12/1938 26/01/1939 29 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/04/1939 26/04/1939 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 07/07/1939 07/07/1939 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 24/09/1940 25/09/1940 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/12/1940 11/01/1941 41 days General
Boiler number 3627 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 02/12/1942 09/12/1942 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/10/1943 04/12/1943 37 days General
Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 20/07/1945 20/07/1945 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 05/03/1946 05/03/1946 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/04/1946 11/05/1946 39 days General
Boiler number 3865 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 16/05/1946 18/05/1946 3 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 30/05/1947 28/06/1947 30 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 09/04/1948 09/04/1948 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 04/05/1948 04/06/1948 32 days General
Boiler number 3628 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69833
 
Darlington Works 01/04/1950 06/05/1950 36 days General
Boiler number 3872 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 17/05/1950 18/05/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/10/1951 02/11/1951 32 days General
Boiler number 22380 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 16/09/1952 16/09/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 24/04/1953 01/05/1953 8 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 03/07/1953 15/08/1953 44 days General
Boiler number 22358 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 24/08/1953 05/09/1953 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/02/1955 28/02/1955 22 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/07/1955 17/09/1955 62 days General
Boiler number 22354 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 19/09/1955 22/09/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/03/1956 22/03/1956 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 02/05/1957 02/05/1957 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1750
Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3619
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
21/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
24/08/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
20/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9833    
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
27/05/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69833 from Darlington (51A)    

prev prev