Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 392 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4864 Week
» 23765 Month
» 23765 Year
» 1689141 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1756 on 14/11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9834   07/07/1946
British Railways 69834   09/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
Works Number 3620
To Service Tue 14/11/1925 to Blaydon (BLA)
Withdrawal Tue 11/11/1958 off Thornaby (51L)
Scrapping During 11/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BLA Blaydon (New) on 14/11/1925
SALT Saltburn on 25/05/1928
MID Middlesbrough on 10/05/1934
SALT Saltburn on 28/05/1935
DAR Darlington on 20/03/1939
SALT Saltburn on 13/02/1949
51E Stockton on 13/06/1954
51A Darlington on 19/09/1954
51E Stockton on 13/02/1955
51A Darlington on 25/09/1955
51C West Hartlepool on 15/09/1957
51K Saltburn on 10/11/1957
51D Middlesbrough on 02/02/1958
51L Thornaby on 01/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 11/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 51K Saltburn 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
WDN   on 11/11/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
14/11/1925 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3620)
04/12/1932 Westinghouse Brake removed
04/12/1932 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3627)
04/12/1932 Steam Brake fitted
02/10/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3626)
19/05/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3620)
08/08/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3625)
03/03/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3620)
18/04/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3864)
09/09/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 152)
04/02/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3864)
29/09/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22352)
07/06/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22354)
03/10/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22355)
14/11/1956 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22358)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 14/07/1926 16/07/1926 3 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 25/04/1929 04/07/1929 71 days General  
Gateshead Works 18/11/1930 27/01/1931 71 days General  
Gateshead Works 10/06/1932 30/06/1932 21 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/11/1932 04/12/1932 34 days General
Boiler number 3627 (Diagram 18)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 26/10/1934 10/11/1934 16 days General  
Darlington Works 15/06/1936 02/10/1936 110 days General
Boiler number 3626 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 09/10/1936 23/10/1936 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/04/1939 19/05/1939 36 days General
Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 31/05/1939 20/06/1939 21 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/06/1941 08/08/1941 47 days General
Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 02/12/1942 23/12/1942 22 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/02/1944 03/03/1944 32 days General
Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 10/08/1945 31/08/1945 22 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/03/1946 18/04/1946 37 days General
Boiler number 3864 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 25/04/1946 08/05/1946 14 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/10/1947 20/10/1947 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 23/02/1948 09/04/1948 47 days General
Renumbered to BR 69834
 
Darlington Works 02/10/1948 06/01/1949 97 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 20/05/1949 04/06/1949 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 16/09/1949 14/10/1949 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/12/1949 09/01/1950 26 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 18/01/1950 04/02/1950 18 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 3864 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 31/05/1950 31/05/1950 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 03/08/1950 29/09/1950 58 days General
Boiler number 22352 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 22/01/1951 22/01/1951 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 11/02/1952 11/02/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 14/05/1952 07/06/1952 25 days General
Boiler number 22354 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 09/06/1952 10/06/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/06/1952 11/07/1952 19 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/08/1952 03/10/1952 39 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22355 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 20/10/1952 23/10/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 10/07/1954 04/09/1954 57 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 01/10/1956 14/11/1956 45 days General
Boiler number 22358 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 01/07/1957 06/08/1957 37 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/11/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1756
Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3620
Allocated to Blaydon (BLA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
25/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
10/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
28/05/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
20/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9834    
09/09/1948 Modification Diagram 18 number 152 boiler fitted    
13/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
19/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
13/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
25/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
10/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (51K)    
02/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
01/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
11/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69834 from Thornaby (51L)    

prev prev