Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 486 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6097 Week
» 17143 Month
» 17143 Year
» 1682519 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1760 on 25/11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9835   11/08/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E9835   13/02/1948
British Railways 69835   07/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
Works Number 3621
To Service Wed 25/11/1925 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Wed 26/11/1958 off Stockton (51E)
Scrapping During 06/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 33 yrs , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) on 25/11/1925
BLA Blaydon on 02/12/1925
SALT Saltburn on 25/05/1928
DAR Darlington on 10/04/1939
NEA Neasden on 07/11/1943
DAR Darlington on 27/03/1945
32A Norwich Thorpe on 28/01/1951
30A Stratford on 08/04/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe on 13/05/1951
51A Darlington on 05/08/1951
53B Hull Botanic Gardens on 13/06/1954
51E Stockton on 16/06/1957
   Withdrawn on 26/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 19/05/1951
LOAN 51A Darlington on 05/08/1951
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 13/07/1957
WDN   on 26/11/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
25/11/1925 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3621)
15/03/1932 Steam Brake fitted
15/03/1932 Westinghouse Brake removed
19/02/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3617)
14/06/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3623)
07/04/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3622)
19/07/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3618)
30/06/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3857)
07/04/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3870)
10/01/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22360)
20/01/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22394)
18/04/1957 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22374)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 28/04/1926 17/05/1926 20 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 30/09/1927 29/12/1927 91 days General  
Darlington Works 25/11/1929 29/01/1930 66 days General  
Darlington Works 02/02/1932 15/03/1932 43 days General
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 12/01/1934 19/02/1934 39 days General
Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 08/05/1935 14/06/1935 38 days General
Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 18/02/1937 07/04/1937 49 days General
Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 23/02/1939 13/04/1939 50 days General  
Darlington Works 14/04/1939 26/04/1939 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/07/1940 29/08/1940 51 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/04/1941 02/04/1941 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 02/06/1941 19/07/1941 48 days General
Boiler number 3618 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 29/07/1941 06/08/1941 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/08/1941 15/08/1941 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/05/1943 30/06/1943 38 days General
Boiler number 22366 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 27/04/1946 29/05/1946 33 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/02/1947 17/05/1947 94 days General  
Darlington Works 29/05/1947 06/06/1947 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/01/1948 13/02/1948 35 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9835
 
Darlington Works 09/03/1949 07/04/1949 30 days General
Boiler number 3870 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69835
 
Darlington Works 14/04/1949 02/05/1949 19 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/12/1950 10/01/1951 36 days General
Boiler number 22360 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 20/11/1952 20/11/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 08/12/1952 17/01/1953 41 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 23/01/1953 28/01/1953 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/12/1954 20/01/1955 39 days General
Boiler number 22394 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 22/03/1957 18/04/1957 28 days General
Boiler number 22374 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1957 26/04/1957 4 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/02/1948 Darlington Works On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere SLS/194803
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906
28/02/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. SLS/195004

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/11/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1760
Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3621
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
02/12/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
25/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
10/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
07/11/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
27/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9835    
28/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
05/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
26/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69835 from Stockton (51E)    

prev prev