Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 281 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5892 Week
» 16938 Month
» 16938 Year
» 1682314 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 1767 on 11/12/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9837   11/08/1946
British Railways 69837   28/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
Works Number 3623
To Service Wed 11/12/1925 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Wed 03/12/1958 off Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)
Scrapping During 12/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) on 11/12/1925
NEV Neville Hill m/e 02/1926
GHD Gateshead on 20/05/1926
SALT Saltburn on 28/05/1928
DAR Darlington on 10/04/1939
32A Norwich Thorpe on 18/02/1951
30A Stratford on 08/04/1951
32A Norwich Thorpe on 20/05/1951
51A Darlington on 01/07/1951
53B Hull Botanic Gardens on 06/07/1952
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 18/02/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe on 18/02/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 12/07/1952
WDN   on 03/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/12/1925 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3623)
17/01/1933 Westinghouse Brake removed
17/01/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3620)
17/01/1933 Steam Brake fitted
23/02/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3618)
31/12/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3627)
15/06/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3628)
28/05/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 947)
18/10/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22350)
23/10/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22383)
20/02/1958 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22354)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 01/09/1926 14/09/1926 14 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 18/07/1928 21/09/1928 66 days General  
Gateshead Works 06/12/1928 14/12/1928 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/10/1929 06/11/1929 30 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/11/1930 31/12/1930 51 days General  
Darlington Works 29/11/1932 17/01/1933 50 days General
Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18)
Steam Brake fitted
 
Darlington Works 18/01/1935 23/02/1935 37 days General
Boiler number 3618 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 18/03/1935 26/03/1935 9 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 08/10/1936 20/02/1937 136 days General  
Darlington Works 23/02/1937 05/03/1937 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/05/1937 14/05/1937 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/11/1938 24/03/1939 123 days General  
Darlington Works 27/03/1939 28/03/1939 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/04/1941 09/06/1941 43 days General
Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1943 08/03/1943 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/11/1943 31/12/1943 47 days General
Boiler number 3627 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 10/01/1944 20/01/1944 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/01/1945 05/02/1945 24 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 11/12/1945 11/12/1945 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/01/1946 25/01/1946 25 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/05/1946 15/06/1946 32 days General
Boiler number 3628 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 24/06/1946 08/07/1946 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/05/1947 01/05/1947 1 day Weighing  
Gateshead Works 09/07/1947 23/08/1947 46 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 03/03/1948 03/03/1948 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 03/04/1948 28/05/1948 56 days General
Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69837
 
Darlington Works 04/06/1948 21/06/1948 18 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/09/1949 12/10/1949 42 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 23/05/1950 08/07/1950 47 days General  
Darlington Works 09/08/1950 25/08/1950 17 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/06/1952 05/06/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 11/06/1952 11/06/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 26/06/1952 26/06/1952 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 22/09/1952 18/10/1952 27 days General
Boiler number 22350 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1954 23/10/1954 36 days General
Boiler number 22383 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 15/01/1958 20/02/1958 37 days General
Boiler number 22354 (Diagram 18)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/12/1925 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1767
Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3623
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
20/05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
28/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
10/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9837    
18/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
06/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
03/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69837 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    

prev prev