|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 10/01/1924 | 05/02/1924 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1924 | 06/09/1924 | 94 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1929 | 03/01/1930 | 67 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2200 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1932 | 12/08/1932 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1932 | 29/08/1932 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1934 | 12/06/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D2049 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1937 | 06/04/1937 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2492 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1942 | 27/06/1942 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1942 | 28/07/1942 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1944 | 13/05/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2195 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1944 | 09/09/1944 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2197 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1948 | 05/11/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2381 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR 69776 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1948 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1951 | 18/01/1952 | 39 days | General | Rebuilt to Part 1 Boiler number 24727 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
20/08/1954 | Scrapped NER engines | A number of N.E.R. engines have been cut up recently. They include D20 Nos. 62388, 62392; J77 Nos. 68422 an 68401 (this engine has round cab windows and vacuum ejector); G5 No. 67288; J7 No. 8256; A7 No. 69776 and J21 No. 65042/68/75. | SLS/195410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1174 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
10/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1924. Dep: 05/02/1924. | ||
05/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1924. Dep: 06/09/1924. | ||
23/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bullcroft Junction (BUL) | ||
29/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1929. Dep: 03/01/1930. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2200 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
03/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
29/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1932. Dep: 12/08/1932. | ||
12/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1932. Dep: 29/08/1932. | ||
08/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1934. Dep: 12/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2049 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
01/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1937. Dep: 06/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
29/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2492 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
21/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
20/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942. | ||
06/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1942. Dep: 28/07/1942. | ||
19/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2195 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
23/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1944. Dep: 09/09/1944. | ||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
10/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9776 | ||
18/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2197 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
15/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1948. Dep: 05/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2381 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR 69776 |
||
08/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1948. | ||
11/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1951. Dep: 18/01/1952. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to Part 1 Boiler number 24727 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
||
21/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
02/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
14/06/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69776 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
07/1954 | Scrapped | Scrapped |