|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1950 | 21/07/1950 | 38 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1950 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1950 | 04/08/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1951 | 07/11/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1952 | 12/12/1952 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1953 | 10/03/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1953 | 25/08/1953 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1954 | 16/07/1954 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1954 | 30/07/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1955 | 16/03/1955 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1955 | 09/05/1955 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/09/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1956 | 16/03/1956 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1956 | 15/10/1956 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1957 | 28/12/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29875 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1959 | 19/08/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29833 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1961 | 29/04/1961 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29781 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1962 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/05/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60536, name: TRIMBUSH Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2027 Allocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
26/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
01/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
20/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
26/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
14/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1950. Dep: 21/07/1950. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
25/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/07/1950. | ||
31/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/07/1950. Dep: 04/08/1950. | ||
08/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/10/1951. Dep: 07/11/1951. | ||
05/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/11/1952. Dep: 12/12/1952. | ||
04/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1953. Dep: 10/03/1953. | ||
13/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1953. Dep: 25/08/1953. | ||
02/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1954. Dep: 16/07/1954. | ||
26/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/07/1954. Dep: 30/07/1954. | ||
07/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1955. Dep: 16/03/1955. | ||
29/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1955. Dep: 09/05/1955. | ||
12/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955. | ||
10/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1956. Dep: 16/03/1956. | ||
03/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1956. Dep: 15/10/1956. | ||
30/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. | ||
27/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1957. Dep: 28/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29875 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1959. Dep: 19/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29833 (Diagram 118) |
||
23/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1961. Dep: 29/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29781 (Diagram 117) |
||
13/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
14/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
08/10/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60536 from York (North) (50A) | ||
17/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/12/1962. |