|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1949 | 28/10/1949 | 33 days | General | Multi-valve regulator & double chimney fitted Double Chimney fitted Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1950 | 26/09/1950 | 6 days | Special | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1951 | 11/04/1951 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1952 | 16/01/1952 | 14 days | Light Casual | After derailment |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1952 | 20/08/1952 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/05/1953 | 07/05/1953 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1953 | 04/12/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29854 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1955 | 24/03/1955 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1956 | 06/06/1956 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1957 | 07/08/1957 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1958 | 25/09/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1959 | 23/07/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29848 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1961 | 09/11/1961 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29822 (Diagram 118) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/06/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60538, name: VELOCITY Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2029 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
26/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 28/10/1949. Work undertaken: Multi-valve regulator & double chimney fitted Double Chimney fitted Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
21/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 21/09/1950. Dep: 26/09/1950. | ||
12/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1951. Dep: 11/04/1951. | ||
03/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1952. Dep: 16/01/1952. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
16/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/07/1952. Dep: 20/08/1952. | ||
04/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/05/1953. Dep: 07/05/1953. | ||
05/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1953. Dep: 04/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29854 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1955. Dep: 24/03/1955. | ||
30/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1956. Dep: 06/06/1956. | ||
29/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 07/08/1957. | ||
15/02/1958 | Modification | Diagram 118 number 29822 boiler fitted | ||
15/02/1958 | Modification | Diagram 118 number 9651 boiler fitted | ||
17/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/09/1958. Dep: 25/09/1958. | ||
10/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1959. Dep: 23/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29848 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
01/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
03/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1961. Dep: 09/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29822 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60538 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
13/05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |