Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 506 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7189 Week
» 18235 Month
» 18235 Year
» 1683611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) E6002 12/03/1962
TOPS (Tops) 73002 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class 73
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service 12/03/1962
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) on 12/03/1962


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
11/03/1962 To Service To service as E6002
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 73002    

prev prev