|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/04/1949 | 25/05/1949 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9877 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61035 |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1949 | 09/06/1949 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1951 | 31/05/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28641 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1952 | 29/01/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28454 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1953 | 11/04/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1954 | 02/07/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28428 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1954 | 12/07/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1955 | 26/11/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28110 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1955 | 29/11/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1956 | 08/03/1956 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1957 | 14/02/1957 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1957 | 02/10/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28444 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1957 | 06/11/1957 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1959 | 15/08/1959 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28113 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1962 | 16/02/1962 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28333 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
20/03/1954 | York Excursions | On 20/3/54 three excursion trains were run from York to Warrington for an important Rugby League match, the first train travelling via Leeds and the following two via Normanton; they were hauled respectively by 61224, 61084 an 61176 (all 50A). On 27/3/54 61224 (50A) worked the York portion of a North Eastern Region special dining excursion for the Grand National at Aintree, leaving York at 8.45 a.m. On 28/4/54 43133 (65A) was noted at York about 2.30 p.m. working a train of empties from Hull to Heaton. 60007 (34A) failed at Thirsk on 23/4/54 whilst working the Up Tees-Tyne Pullman, 9.25 a.m. Newcastle to King's Cross. It was replaced by 60981, the York south end pilot, which ran out light to Thirsk with the minimum of delay. In the evening 60007 was hauled into York shed by 61035 (50B). |
SLS/195406 |
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/10/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1035, name: PRONGHORN Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2015 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
05/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
10/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
28/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1949. Dep: 25/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9877 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61035 |
||
31/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1949. Dep: 09/06/1949. | ||
30/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1951. Dep: 31/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28641 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1952. Dep: 29/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28454 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953. | ||
01/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1954. Dep: 02/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28428 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1954. Dep: 12/07/1954. | ||
02/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1955. Dep: 26/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28110 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1955. Dep: 29/11/1955. | ||
01/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1956. Dep: 08/03/1956. | ||
17/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1957. Dep: 14/02/1957. | ||
03/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1957. Dep: 02/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28444 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1957. Dep: 06/11/1957. | ||
30/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1959. Dep: 15/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28113 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
15/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1962. Dep: 16/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28333 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
03/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61035 from York (North) (50A) | ||
02/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |