|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/09/1947 | 14/11/1947 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1948 | 08/01/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9739 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61062 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1950 | 14/07/1950 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 9928 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1950 | 04/08/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1951 | 25/10/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28225 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1951 | 31/10/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1952 | 31/12/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28456 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1953 | 11/04/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1954 | 30/04/1954 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1954 | 23/12/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28105 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1955 | 02/02/1955 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1955 | 10/05/1955 | 40 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1956 | 21/11/1956 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28864 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1958 | 06/01/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28224 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1959 | 19/06/1959 | 37 days | Heavy Casual | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1961 | 31/08/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28216 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1961 | 14/09/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1062 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25818 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
26/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947. | ||
11/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9739 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61062 |
||
20/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 14/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9928 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1950. Dep: 04/08/1950. | ||
29/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1951. Dep: 25/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28225 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1951. Dep: 31/10/1951. | ||
03/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1952. Dep: 31/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28456 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953. | ||
30/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1954. Dep: 30/04/1954. | ||
26/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1954. Dep: 23/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28105 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/01/1955. Dep: 02/02/1955. | ||
01/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/04/1955. Dep: 10/05/1955. | ||
25/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1956. Dep: 21/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28864 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1958. Dep: 06/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28224 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1959. Dep: 19/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
31/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1961. Dep: 31/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28216 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1961. Dep: 14/09/1961. | ||
03/08/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61062 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/09/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |