|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 11/02/1948 | 20/03/1948 | 39 days | Heavy | |||
Stratford Works | 02/11/1948 | 21/12/1948 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61104 |
||
Stratford Works | 08/08/1950 | 09/09/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28500 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/06/1952 | 26/07/1952 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28556 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/03/1954 | 18/05/1954 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 10834 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/04/1956 | 29/05/1956 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 28410 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 24/07/1958 | 05/09/1958 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28166 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1960 | 06/12/1960 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28517 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
03/05/1964 | Doncaster Works (Waiting Works) | Near Erecting Shop: E3101-4 bodies. Works Yard: D1562 damaged, 68925, DEP100, D5513, D5593, D5815, D5816, D6734, D6737, D6757, D8234. Inside Erecting Shop: 12103, D1695, D2212, D2216, D2572, D3631, D4061, D5052, D5526, D5575, D5582, D5601, D5688, D5693, D5814, D5820, D5831, D5838, D6720, D6744, D8211, D8239, D8400, D9015. Side of Stripping Shop: D3446. Side of Erecting Shop: 63601. Waiting Cutting Up: 90263. Stripping Shop: D1508, D3484, D5564, D5603, D9008. Outside Weigh Shop: D380 ex works, D2013 ex works, D1509, D4031, D5573, D5631. Inside Paint Shop: LNER 4771, E1217, D2563, D6898. Waiting Works: 61104, 63594, 63645, 63836, 90717. Ex Works: D5528. Stored: 61080, 90111, 90165, 90583, 92169, 92170, 92175. | SLS/196406 |
07/06/1964 | Doncaster Shed (Waiting Works) | Waiting Works: D2233, 61104, 63594, 63645/7, 63836, 90717 | SLS/196407 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1104 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25864 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
07/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
01/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
07/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
11/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/02/1948. Dep: 20/03/1948. | ||
02/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1948. Dep: 21/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61104 |
||
08/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28500 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28556 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1954. Dep: 18/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10834 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1956. Dep: 29/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28410 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1958. Dep: 05/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28166 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
08/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
03/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
29/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
10/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
04/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1960. Dep: 06/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28517 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
09/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
18/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61104 from Canklow (41D) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by W.E.Smiths: Ecclesfield |