|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/09/1948 | 30/10/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9718 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61115 |
||
Darlington Works | 21/06/1949 | 02/07/1949 | 12 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1950 | 08/01/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28123 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1952 | 27/09/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28447 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1952 | 30/09/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1954 | 13/05/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28419 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1955 | 05/11/1955 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28146 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1955 | 08/11/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1955 | 13/12/1955 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1957 | 22/11/1957 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28309 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1959 | 18/08/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1960 | 26/08/1960 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 28850 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1963 | 09/11/1963 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28226 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/01/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1115 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25871 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
25/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9718 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61115 |
||
21/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/06/1949. Dep: 02/07/1949. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1950. Dep: 08/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28123 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28447 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1952. Dep: 30/09/1952. | ||
08/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1954. Dep: 13/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28419 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28146 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1955. Dep: 08/11/1955. | ||
06/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1955. Dep: 13/12/1955. | ||
30/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1957. Dep: 22/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28309 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
05/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1959. Dep: 18/08/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
08/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1960. Dep: 26/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28850 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
24/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1963. Dep: 09/11/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28226 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
12/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
13/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
08/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61115 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
21/07/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |