|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 22/09/1947 | 22/09/1947 | 1 day | Unclassified | Stub axle to weld |
||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1949 | 09/09/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3599 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61176 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1950 | 14/10/1950 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1951 | 17/08/1951 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28221 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1953 | 04/07/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28206 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1954 | 22/01/1954 | 10 days | Light Casual | Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/09/1954 | 22/09/1954 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1955 | 13/05/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28394 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1957 | 04/05/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28874 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/1957 | 05/1957 | Unclassified | ||||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1959 | 24/03/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1959 | 29/08/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28175 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1959 | 16/09/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1962 | 20/06/1962 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28227 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
20/03/1954 | York Excursions | On 20/3/54 three excursion trains were run from York to Warrington for an important Rugby League match, the first train travelling via Leeds and the following two via Normanton; they were hauled respectively by 61224, 61084 an 61176 (all 50A). On 27/3/54 61224 (50A) worked the York portion of a North Eastern Region special dining excursion for the Grand National at Aintree, leaving York at 8.45 a.m. On 28/4/54 43133 (65A) was noted at York about 2.30 p.m. working a train of empties from Hull to Heaton. 60007 (34A) failed at Thirsk on 23/4/54 whilst working the Up Tees-Tyne Pullman, 9.25 a.m. Newcastle to King's Cross. It was replaced by 60981, the York south end pilot, which ran out light to Thirsk with the minimum of delay. In the evening 60007 was hauled into York shed by 61035 (50B). |
SLS/195406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1176 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5534 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
22/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1947. Dep: 22/09/1947. Work undertaken: Stub axle to weld |
||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
31/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
06/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
11/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1949. Dep: 09/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3599 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61176 |
||
07/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950. | ||
07/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1951. Dep: 17/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28221 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28206 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
13/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/01/1954. Dep: 22/01/1954. Work undertaken: Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
10/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1954. Dep: 22/09/1954. | ||
13/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1955. Dep: 13/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28394 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
10/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28874 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/05/1957. Dep: ?/05/1957. | ||
23/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1959. Dep: 24/03/1959. | ||
30/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1959. Dep: 29/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28175 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
08/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1959. Dep: 16/09/1959. | ||
21/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1962. Dep: 20/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28227 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
15/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
06/09/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61176 from York (North) (50A) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |