|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/09/1949 | 15/10/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28263 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61228 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1949 | 21/10/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 12/07/1950 | 07/10/1950 | 88 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1950 | 23/10/1950 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1951 | 31/12/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28242 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1953 | 26/09/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28253 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1953 | 03/10/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1956 | 08/02/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28445 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/04/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 194 days | General | Boiler number 28592 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/08/1959 | 28/09/1959 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 28163 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1960 | 05/08/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's were ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1223 (13/8), 1224 (15/8), 1225 (19/8), 1226 (21/8), 1227 (26/8), 1228 (28/8), 1229 (2/9), 1230 (4/9), 1231 (9/9) and 1232 (10/9). On 11/9 Nos. 1233 an 1234 were in the Paint Shop while in the Erecting Shop Nos. 1235 an 1236 were undergoing steaming trials; No. 1237 was minus the bogie but otherwise virtually complete. Additional Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1216 (26117/47), 1217 (26118/47), 1222 (26123/47), 1226-33 (26127-34/47), 1235 (26136/47). | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/08/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1228 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26129 Allocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
31/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
06/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28263 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61228 |
||
19/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1949. Dep: 21/10/1949. | ||
12/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/07/1950. Dep: 07/10/1950. | ||
11/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1950. Dep: 23/10/1950. | ||
06/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1951. Dep: 31/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28242 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28253 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
10/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1956. Dep: 08/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28445 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28592 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1959. Dep: 28/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28163 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
04/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
17/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
03/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1960. Dep: 05/08/1960. | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61228 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Albert Looms: Spondon |