|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1949 | 20/10/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 9850 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61230 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1951 | 14/12/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28161 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28420 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1955 | 22/12/1955 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1956 | 16/11/1956 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28441 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1958 | 11/07/1958 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1959 | 10/04/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28105 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1959 | 29/04/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1959 | 15/05/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1960 | 14/12/1960 | 7 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's were ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1223 (13/8), 1224 (15/8), 1225 (19/8), 1226 (21/8), 1227 (26/8), 1228 (28/8), 1229 (2/9), 1230 (4/9), 1231 (9/9) and 1232 (10/9). On 11/9 Nos. 1233 an 1234 were in the Paint Shop while in the Erecting Shop Nos. 1235 an 1236 were undergoing steaming trials; No. 1237 was minus the bogie but otherwise virtually complete. Additional Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1216 (26117/47), 1217 (26118/47), 1222 (26123/47), 1226-33 (26127-34/47), 1235 (26136/47). | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1230 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26131 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
21/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
11/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1949. Dep: 20/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9850 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61230 |
||
20/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1951. Dep: 14/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28161 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28420 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1955. Dep: 22/12/1955. | ||
22/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28441 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/06/1958. Dep: 11/07/1958. | ||
10/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28105 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
20/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1959. Dep: 29/04/1959. | ||
04/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959. | ||
08/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1960. Dep: 14/12/1960. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
19/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61230 from Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) | ||
09/01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |