|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/04/1948 | 27/04/1948 | 17 days | Special | Renumbered to BR 61251 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1948 | 26/08/1948 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1949 | 09/12/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 9883 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1950 | 21/04/1950 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1951 | 22/11/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28158 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1953 | 16/10/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28162 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/07/1954 | 08/09/1954 | 51 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1955 | 19/01/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28221 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1957 | 16/01/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28153 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1959 | 31/10/1959 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1961 | 18/02/1961 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28583 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Darlington | Further new Class 'Bl' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1241 (8/10), 1242 (10/10), 1243 (14/10), 1244 (16/10), 1245 (20/10), 1246 (22/10), 1247 (24/10), 1248 (27/10), 1249 (29/10), 1250 (31/10)), 1251 (4/11) and 1252 (6/11), which with 1239 (2/10) and 1240 (6/10) give a total of twelve ex Works during October. Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1242 (26143/47) and 1245-1250 (26146/47-26151/47). No. 1250 is the first loco. ex N.B. Loco. Co. Ltd. noted with electric headlamps fitted to engine and tender. | SLS/194712 |
04/07/1948 | Locomotives Trials | Trialed on the ex L.N.E.R. Southern Area up to 4/7, have been: 'A.4' Nos. 22, 60033/34 and 'B.1' Nos. 61251/66. | SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1251 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26152 Allocated to Ipswich (IPS) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
20/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
12/1947 | Naming | Named 'OLIVER BURY' | ||
11/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Special) - Arr: 11/04/1948. Dep: 27/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61251 |
||
26/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/07/1948. Dep: 26/08/1948. | ||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 09/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9883 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/03/1950. Dep: 21/04/1950. | ||
30/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 22/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28158 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1953. Dep: 16/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28162 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/07/1954. Dep: 08/09/1954. | ||
14/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 19/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28221 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1957. Dep: 16/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28153 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
19/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/10/1959. Dep: 31/10/1959. | ||
16/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28583 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
19/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61251 from Immingham (40B) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |