|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 25/01/1950 | 21/03/1950 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 9976 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61273 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1952 | 06/03/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28406 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1954 | 06/03/1954 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28214 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1954 | 25/05/1954 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1955 | 27/07/1955 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1956 | 14/05/1956 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28576 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1956 | 08/06/1956 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1958 | 07/08/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28181 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1958 | 19/08/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1959 | 25/02/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1961 | 08/07/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28409 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1253 (10/11), 1254 (12/11), 1255 (14/11), 1256 (17/11), 1257 (19/11), 1258 (21/11), 1259 (24/11), 1260 (26/11), 1261 (28/11), 1262 (1/12), 1263 (3/12), 1264 (5/12), 1265 (9/12), 1266 (10/12), 1267 (12/12), 1268 (16/12), 1269 (24/12), 1270 (25/12), 1271 (26/12), 1272 (29/12) and 1273 (30/12). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1251 (26152/47), 1252 (26153/47), 1253 (26154/47), 1254 (26155/47), 1256 (26157/47), 1257 (26158/47), 1259 (26160/47), 1260 (26161/47), 1261 (26162/47), 1263 (26164/47), 1264 (26165/47), 1266 (26167/47), 1267 (26168/47), 1270 (26171/47), 1271 (26172/47) and 1272 (26173/47). | SLS/194802 |
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
28/02/1954 | Darlington Works | North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. | SLS/195404 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Waiting Works: D237, 60814, 61020, 63448, 67731/69, 78015, 90415. Ex-Works: 60872, 60928/42, 61273, 61303, 61448/64, 65801/93, 67636/90, 80099, 80100, 90465, 90710, 92147/92. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/12/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1273 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26174 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
25/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1950. Dep: 21/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9976 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61273 |
||
06/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1952. Dep: 06/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28406 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) | ||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28214 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/05/1954. Dep: 25/05/1954. | ||
14/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/07/1955. Dep: 27/07/1955. | ||
19/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 14/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28576 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1956. Dep: 08/06/1956. | ||
23/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1958. Dep: 07/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28181 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1958. Dep: 19/08/1958. | ||
12/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/02/1959. Dep: 25/02/1959. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1961. Dep: 08/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28409 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61273 from York (North) (50A) | ||
16/05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |