|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inverurie Works | 03/02/1948 | 05/02/1948 | 3 days | Light Repair | Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
Inverurie Works | 14/12/1948 | 15/12/1948 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/03/1949 | 06/05/1949 | 58 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61277 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/09/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/09/1953 | 22/10/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28621 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | WPU Gear removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/04/1957 | 13/04/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/12/1957 | 25/01/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28143 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/07/1959 | 15/08/1959 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/08/1959 | 27/08/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/04/1962 | 19/05/1962 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28628 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows: Nos. 1274 (9/1), 1275 (12/1), 1276 (14/1), 1277 (16/1), 1278 (19/1), 1279 (21/1), 1280 (23/1), 1281 (27/1), 1282 (28/1), 1283 (2/2), and 1284 (6/2). Additional Works' Nos. checked are: Nos. 1262 (26163 of 1947), 1274/5 (26175/6 of 1947), 1277/8 (26178/9 of 1947), 1280-4 (26181-5 of 1947). No. 1221 was observed at Cowlairs West Junction, bearing the name Sir Alexander Erskine Hill and still painted green and lettered L.N.E.R. This engine is now fitted with electric lighting | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/01/1948 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1277 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26178 Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
03/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1948. Dep: 05/02/1948. Work undertaken: Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
14/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1948. Dep: 15/12/1948. | ||
10/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1949. Dep: 06/05/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61277 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keith (KEI) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keith (KEI) | ||
01/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
04/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
12/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. | ||
21/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1953. Dep: 22/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28621 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. Work undertaken: WPU Gear removed |
||
10/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957. | ||
04/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
24/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1957. Dep: 25/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28143 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/07/1959. Dep: 15/08/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
26/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1959. Dep: 27/08/1959. Work undertaken: Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
18/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
25/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1962. Dep: 19/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28628 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61277 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Langloan |