|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 31/05/1950 | 24/06/1950 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 9855 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61288 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1950 | 27/06/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1952 | 03/04/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28103 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/04/1952 | 10/04/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1953 | 23/01/1954 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28445 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1955 | 10/12/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28430 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1955 | 14/12/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1958 | 01/03/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28210 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1960 | 07/09/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28588 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1962 | 10/04/1962 | 28 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1962 | 29/11/1962 | 25 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows.-Nos.1285 9/2. 1286 (11/2), 1287 (13/2), 1288 (16/2), 1289 (18/2), 1290 (20/2), 1291 (24/2), 1292 (25/2), 1293 (27/2), 1294 (1/3), 1295 (3/3), 1296 (5/3), 1297 (10/3), 1298 (11/3), 1299 (12/3), 1300 (15/3), 1301 (17/3), 1302 (23/3) and 1303 (26/3). No. 1287 was the last to appear lettered L.N.E.R. No. 1288 and onwards have appeared with 'British Railways' on the tender in 9' high letters and the prefix letter 'E' in front of the number both on the cab side and the buffer beam; all lettering and numbering being in plain yellow Gill Sans style. This week's (3/4) deliveries are expected to appear as 61304 onwards. Further Works Nos. checked are: Nos. 1285-93 (26186-94/47) and 1294- 1303 (26195-204/48), and up to No. 1303 all have appeared with the small cast L.N.E.R. number plates on the cab sides, dated 1947 and not pre fixed 'E.' | SLS/194805 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. | SLS/196205 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/02/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 1288 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26189 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
26/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
02/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
31/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9855 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61288 |
||
26/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1950. Dep: 27/06/1950. | ||
11/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1952. Dep: 03/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28103 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1952. Dep: 10/04/1952. | ||
30/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28445 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1955. Dep: 10/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28430 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1955. Dep: 14/12/1955. | ||
31/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1958. Dep: 01/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28210 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1960. Dep: 07/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28588 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
14/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1962. Dep: 10/04/1962. | ||
05/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/11/1962. Dep: 29/11/1962. | ||
06/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61288 from York (North) (50A) | ||
27/01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |