|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1950 | 03/07/1950 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 9968 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61296 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1952 | 06/07/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1954 | 09/10/1954 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 28422 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1957 | 07/09/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 10823 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1959 | 14/09/1959 | 74 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28194 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/03/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 1296 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26197 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
23/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1950. Dep: 03/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9968 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61296 |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C) | ||
12/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1952. Dep: 06/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28422 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
12/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10823 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1959. Dep: 14/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28194 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61296 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
01/02/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |