|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/05/1951 | 07/06/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28214 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1953 | 15/10/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28463 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/05/1954 | 24/05/1954 | 15 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1955 | 23/01/1956 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28428 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1958 | 11/06/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28453 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1958 | 27/06/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1961 | 26/08/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28951 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 12 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61316 (4/5), 61317 (6/5), 61318 (11/5), 61319 (14/5), 61320 (18/5), 61321 (20/5), 61322 (25/5) and 61323 (27/5). Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61316-19 (26217-20/48), 61321-23 (26222-24/48). | SLS/194807 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/05/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61320 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26221 Allocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
09/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1951. Dep: 07/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28214 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1953. Dep: 15/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28463 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1954. Dep: 24/05/1954. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
28/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1955. Dep: 23/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28428 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
23/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
13/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1958. Dep: 11/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28453 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1958. Dep: 27/06/1958. | ||
31/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1961. Dep: 26/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28951 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
12/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961. | ||
05/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
19/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61320 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |