|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 06/05/1950 | 27/05/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 9948 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1952 | 26/04/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28104 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 10830 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1956 | 28/04/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28136 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1956 | 04/09/1956 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1958 | 18/07/1958 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28757 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1959 | 29/07/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1960 | 10/08/1960 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28119 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1961 | 27/07/1961 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1963 | 18/04/1963 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28402 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1963 | 22/07/1963 | 39 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1948 | Queens Park Works | Further new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's have appeared ex Q.P. Works as follows:-Nos. 61324 (1/6), 61325 (3/6), 61326 (8/6), 61327 (11/6), 61328 (16/6), 61329 (18/6), 61330 (23/6), 61331 (25/6), 61332 (30/6). No. 61315 was ex Works on 30/4. Further Works' Nos. checked are Nos. 61324-25 (26225-26/48), 61327-33 (26228-34/48). | SLS/194808 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
10/03/1963 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. | SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 | Worcester Works (Stripping Shop) | 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. | SLS/196304 |
10/12/1965 | Doncaster MPD | Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. | SLS/196601 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/06/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 61326 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26227 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
06/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1950. Dep: 27/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9948 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
24/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
31/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28104 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10830 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
23/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1956. Dep: 28/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28136 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1956. Dep: 04/09/1956. | ||
05/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1958. Dep: 18/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28757 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/07/1959. Dep: 29/07/1959. | ||
08/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1960. Dep: 10/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28119 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/07/1961. Dep: 27/07/1961. | ||
06/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1963. Dep: 18/04/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28402 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/06/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1963. Dep: 22/07/1963. | ||
20/03/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61326 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath |