Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 830 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6230 Week
» 24282 Month
» 257202 Year
» 1922578 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 61368 on 30/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class B1
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L997
Works Number 26827
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service Mon 30/04/1950
Withdrawal Mon 29/01/1962 off Woodford Halse (2F)
Service Life 11 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Notes
Notes 31/1/62 In for cutting up at Darlington

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/04/1950
38A   Colwick on 05/05/1950
38E   Woodford Halse on 20/05/1951
38E   Woodford Halse w/e 26/05/1951
     Withdrawn on 29/01/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 38A Colwick on 05/05/1950
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 26/05/1951
WDN   w/e 03/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/04/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 10818)
22/11/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28236)
28/02/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28459)
08/01/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28243)
28/03/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28815)
19/11/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28800)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 17/10/1951 22/11/1951 37 days General Boiler number 28236 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 04/02/1953 28/02/1953 25 days General Boiler number 28459 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1953 03/03/1953 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 13/11/1954 08/01/1955 57 days General Boiler number 28243 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 27/02/1956 28/03/1956 31 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 28815 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 15/11/1956 13/12/1956 29 days Heavy Intermediate    
Darlington Works 18/12/1956 20/12/1956 3 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 17/10/1958 19/11/1958 34 days General Boiler number 28800 (Diagram 100A)
 
Darlington Works 03/12/1958 09/12/1958 7 days Unclassified    
Stratford Works 20/07/1959 29/07/1959 10 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 20/07/1960 18/10/1960 91 days Heavy Casual    
Darlington Works 27/10/1960 10/11/1960 15 days Unclassified    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/02/1962 Darlington Works (Scrap Road) Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. SLS/196204
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 61368
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26827
Diagram 100A boiler fitted
   
05/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
26/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
17/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1951. Dep: 22/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28236 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28459 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1953. Dep: 03/03/1953.    
13/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1954. Dep: 08/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28243 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1956. Dep: 28/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28815 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/11/1956. Dep: 13/12/1956.    
18/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/12/1956. Dep: 20/12/1956.    
17/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1958. Dep: 19/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28800 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/12/1958. Dep: 09/12/1958.    
20/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/07/1959. Dep: 29/07/1959.    
20/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/07/1960. Dep: 18/10/1960.    
27/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1960. Dep: 10/11/1960.    
29/01/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 61368 from Woodford Halse (2F)    
03/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev