Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 633 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1541 Week
» 12686 Month
» 112471 Year
» 1777847 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1169 m/e 11/1917
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 Tmp) 1169C   25/08/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6169   27/06/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1480   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1494   01/09/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1917 LORD FARINGDON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B3/111/1917
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1917 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Sat 06/12/1947 off Lincoln (LIN)
Service Life 30 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GOR   Gorton (New) m/e 11/1917
IMM   Immingham m/e 01/1923
KX   Kings Cross m/e 08/1923
MEX   Mexborough m/e 11/1923
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 15/05/1924
KX   Kings Cross on 11/08/1925
GOR   Gorton on 27/09/1925
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 10/10/1925
KX   Kings Cross on 12/12/1925
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) m/e 02/1927
GOR   Gorton on 21/04/1927
NEA   Neasden on 24/10/1927
GOR   Gorton on 07/11/1928
NEA   Neasden on 02/03/1929
IMM   Immingham on 15/05/1930
NEA   Neasden on 20/03/1933
IMM   Immingham on 17/06/1933
GOR   Gorton on 18/09/1933
IMM   Immingham on 11/12/1935
WFD   Woodford Halse on 21/07/1939
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 12/07/1942
GOR   Gorton on 24/12/1942
NEA   Neasden on 24/12/1944
IMM   Immingham on 16/04/1945
LIN   Lincoln on 01/06/1947
     Withdrawn on 06/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 01/06/1947
WDN LIN Lincoln on 06/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1917 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1712)
29/04/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 599)
27/06/1925 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1846)
10/05/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1935)
30/04/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 556)
13/06/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 579)
05/03/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3001)
18/11/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 242)
10/10/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3015)
27/07/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3047)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 07/03/1922 29/04/1922 54 days General Boiler number 599 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/04/1923 14/04/1923 8 days Heavy Valves & pistons
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1923 25/08/1923 29 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1169C
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1925 27/06/1925 57 days General Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6169
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1926 17/04/1926 22 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 28/05/1927 23/07/1927 57 days General    
Gorton Works 10/11/1928 02/02/1929 85 days General    
Gorton Works 29/03/1930 10/05/1930 43 days General Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1932 30/04/1932 36 days General Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1932 08/10/1932 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 29/04/1933 17/06/1933 50 days General    
Gorton Works 04/08/1934 01/09/1934 29 days General    
Gorton Works 16/05/1936 13/06/1936 29 days General Boiler number 579 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1938 05/03/1938 29 days General Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 18/11/1939 22 days General Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1942 10/10/1942 37 days General Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1942 26/12/1942 30 days Light Repair New Right Hand outside cylinder
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1944 04/11/1944 26 days General    
Gorton Works 29/09/1945 29/09/1945 1 day Light Repair    
Gorton Works 01/06/1946 27/07/1946 57 days General Boiler number 3047 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1947 06/12/1947 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1917 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1169, name: LORD FARINGDON
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
07/03/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1922. Dep: 29/04/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 599 (Diagram 13)
   
01/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
07/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/04/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923.
Work undertaken:
Valves & pistons
   
28/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1923. Dep: 25/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1169C
   
08/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
11/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
15/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
02/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 27/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6169
   
11/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
27/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
12/12/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
27/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1926. Dep: 17/04/1926.    
02/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
21/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927.    
24/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
07/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1928. Dep: 02/02/1929.    
02/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
29/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1930. Dep: 10/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13)
   
15/05/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
26/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13)
   
01/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/10/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932.    
20/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
29/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933.    
17/06/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
18/09/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 01/09/1934.    
11/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
16/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 579 (Diagram 13)
   
05/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13)
   
21/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
28/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13)
   
12/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
04/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13)
   
27/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1942. Dep: 26/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
New Right Hand outside cylinder
   
24/12/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944.    
24/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
16/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
29/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1480 but not taken up    
01/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3047 (Diagram 13)
   
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1494    
01/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
06/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1494 from Lincoln (LIN)    
06/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947.    

prev