|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/05/1922 | 24/06/1922 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1923 | 15/12/1923 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 406 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1164C |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1925 | 11/07/1925 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6164 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1926 | 19/02/1927 | 113 days | General | Intensifore changed to 6-feed. Eureka split to 10 points |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1928 | 10/11/1928 | 92 days | General | New inside cylinders |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1929 | 19/10/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1930 | 15/11/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1931 | 31/12/1931 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1932 | 26/11/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1927 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1934 | 10/02/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1935 | 13/04/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1936 | 14/11/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1938 | 02/04/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1939 | 24/06/1939 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class B3/2 Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1940 | 23/11/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1941 | 20/09/1941 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1942 | 13/02/1943 | 52 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1944 | 13/01/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3045 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1920 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1164, name: EARL BEATTY Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
22/10/1920 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
13/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1922. Dep: 24/06/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1923. Dep: 15/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 406 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1164C |
||
15/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
05/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
25/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1925. Dep: 11/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6164 |
||
23/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
05/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
08/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
30/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1926. Dep: 19/02/1927. Work undertaken: Intensifore changed to 6-feed. Eureka split to 10 points |
||
23/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 10/11/1928. Work undertaken: New inside cylinders |
||
12/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
14/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1930. Dep: 15/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13) |
||
06/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
12/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13) |
||
12/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1932. Dep: 26/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1927 (Diagram 13) |
||
13/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/12/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13) |
||
13/04/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13) |
||
08/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B3/2 Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13) |
||
24/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
26/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13) |
||
19/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941. | ||
03/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
19/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943. | ||
13/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
02/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3045 (Diagram 13) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1481 but not taken up | ||
07/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1495 | ||
28/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
27/09/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1495 from Immingham (IMM) |