Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 565 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1473 Week
» 12618 Month
» 112403 Year
» 1777779 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1164 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 Tmp) 1164C   15/12/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6164   11/07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1481   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1495   07/10/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1920 EARL BEATTY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B3/106/1920
B3/2 (4-6-0)24/06/1939
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1920 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Sat 27/09/1947 off Immingham (IMM)
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GOR   Gorton (New) m/e 06/1920
IMM   Immingham on 22/10/1920
KX   Kings Cross on 15/02/1924
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 05/08/1924
KX   Kings Cross on 23/07/1925
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 05/10/1925
KX   Kings Cross on 08/11/1925
GOR   Gorton on 23/02/1927
IMM   Immingham on 12/12/1928
NEA   Neasden on 06/12/1930
GOR   Gorton on 05/12/1934
IMM   Immingham on 13/04/1935
WFD   Woodford Halse on 24/07/1939
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 03/04/1942
WFD   Woodford Halse on 19/07/1942
GOR   Gorton on 21/11/1942
NEA   Neasden on 13/02/1943
IMM   Immingham on 28/06/1947
     Withdrawn on 27/09/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 28/06/1947
WDN IMM Immingham on 27/09/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1920 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1845)
24/06/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1712)
15/12/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 406)
19/10/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 610)
15/11/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1846)
31/12/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 267)
26/11/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1927)
10/02/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 51)
13/04/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 59)
14/11/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 244)
02/04/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3004)
24/06/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3017)
23/11/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 534)
13/01/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3045)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 13/05/1922 24/06/1922 43 days General Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1923 15/12/1923 78 days General Boiler number 406 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1164C
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1925 11/07/1925 78 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6164
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1926 19/02/1927 113 days General Intensifore changed to 6-feed. Eureka split to 10 points
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1928 10/11/1928 92 days General New inside cylinders
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1929 19/10/1929 36 days General Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1930 15/11/1930 43 days General Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1931 31/12/1931 20 days General Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1932 26/11/1932 15 days General Boiler number 1927 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1934 10/02/1934 29 days General Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1935 13/04/1935 15 days General Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1936 14/11/1936 22 days General Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1938 02/04/1938 29 days General Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1939 24/06/1939 78 days General Rebuilt to class B3/2
Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1940 23/11/1940 29 days General Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1941 20/09/1941 33 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 24/12/1942 13/02/1943 52 days General    
Gorton Works 02/12/1944 13/01/1945 43 days General Boiler number 3045 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1164, name: EARL BEATTY
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
22/10/1920 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
13/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1922. Dep: 24/06/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13)
   
29/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1923. Dep: 15/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 406 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1164C
   
15/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
05/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
25/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1925. Dep: 11/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6164
   
23/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
05/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
08/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
30/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1926. Dep: 19/02/1927.
Work undertaken:
Intensifore changed to 6-feed. Eureka split to 10 points
   
23/02/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 10/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
New inside cylinders
   
12/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
14/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13)
   
04/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1930. Dep: 15/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1846 (Diagram 13)
   
06/12/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
12/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 267 (Diagram 13)
   
12/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1932. Dep: 26/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1927 (Diagram 13)
   
13/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
   
05/12/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13)
   
13/04/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13)
   
05/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
   
08/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B3/2
Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 13)
   
24/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
26/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
   
19/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.    
03/04/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
19/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943.    
13/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
02/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3045 (Diagram 13)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1481 but not taken up    
07/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1495    
28/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
27/09/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1495 from Immingham (IMM)    

prev prev