Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 40 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4759 Week
» 15904 Month
» 115689 Year
» 1781065 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1165 m/e 07/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6165   31/01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1482   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1496   01/09/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1920 VALOUR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B3/107/1920
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1920 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Wed 31/12/1947 off Lincoln (LIN)
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GOR   Gorton (New) m/e 07/1920
KX   Kings Cross on 11/08/1923
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 06/10/1925
KX   Kings Cross on 27/11/1925
GOR   Gorton on 28/03/1927
IMM   Immingham on 15/12/1928
NEA   Neasden on 14/11/1931
IMM   Immingham on 03/06/1932
NEA   Neasden on 21/04/1933
GOR   Gorton on 06/12/1934
IMM   Immingham on 21/02/1935
NEA   Neasden on 07/12/1935
IMM   Immingham on 28/11/1938
WFD   Woodford Halse on 25/07/1939
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 25/03/1942
GOR   Gorton on 21/11/1942
NEA   Neasden on 24/12/1944
IMM   Immingham on 16/04/1945
LIN   Lincoln on 01/06/1947
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln on 01/06/1947
WDN LIN Lincoln on 31/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1920 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1846)
31/01/1925 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1712)
04/06/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1849)
07/11/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 571)
27/05/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 295)
18/08/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 773)
08/05/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3005)
15/10/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)
15/06/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3003)
30/05/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3038)
15/06/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3033)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 25/02/1922 01/04/1922 36 days General    
Gorton Works 23/06/1923 11/08/1923 50 days General Ex works in full GC livery (only touched up)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1924 31/01/1925 78 days General Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6165
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1925 18/04/1925 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 31/10/1925 14/11/1925 15 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 02/04/1927 04/06/1927 64 days General Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1928 15/09/1928 64 days General    
Gorton Works 13/10/1928 13/10/1928 1 day Light Repair    
Gorton Works 12/04/1930 07/06/1930 57 days General    
Gorton Works 24/10/1931 07/11/1931 15 days General Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1933 27/05/1933 29 days General Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1933 14/05/1933 15 days Light Repair Side screens fitted
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1934 18/08/1934 29 days General Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1935 12/10/1935 29 days General    
Gorton Works 10/04/1937 08/05/1937 29 days General Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1938 15/10/1938 50 days General Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1940 15/06/1940 29 days General Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1942 30/05/1942 27 days General Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1944 27/05/1944 29 days General    
Gorton Works 04/05/1946 15/06/1946 43 days General Boiler number 3033 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1947 31/12/1947 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1920 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1165, name: VALOUR
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
25/02/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1922. Dep: 01/04/1922.    
23/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Ex works in full GC livery (only touched up)
   
11/08/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
15/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1924. Dep: 31/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1712 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6165
   
11/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925.    
06/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
31/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925.    
27/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
28/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
   
14/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1928. Dep: 15/09/1928.    
13/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928.    
15/12/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
12/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930.    
24/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1931. Dep: 07/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
   
14/11/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
03/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
21/04/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
29/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 27/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13)
   
30/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/04/1933. Dep: 14/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Side screens fitted
   
21/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13)
   
06/12/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
14/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.    
07/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
10/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
   
27/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
   
28/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
25/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
18/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
   
25/03/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
04/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1942. Dep: 30/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3038 (Diagram 13)
   
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944.    
24/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
16/04/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1482 but not taken up    
04/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3033 (Diagram 13)
   
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1496    
01/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
31/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1496 from Lincoln (LIN)    
31/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947.    

prev prev