Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1039 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 2211 Week
» 21112 Month
» 21112 Year
» 1686488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1167 m/e 09/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 Tmp) 1167C m/e 09/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6167   05/07/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1484   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1498   21/09/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1920 LLOYD GEORGE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B3/109/1920
B3/2 (4-6-0)25/06/1938
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1920 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Wed 31/12/1947 off Immingham (IMM)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 27 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 09/1920
KX Kings Cross on 02/08/1923
IMM Immingham m/e 12/1923
KX Kings Cross on 05/08/1924
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) on 05/08/1925
KX Kings Cross on 12/12/1925
GOR Gorton on 07/03/1927
NEA Neasden on 14/06/1929
IMM Immingham on 16/07/1931
NEA Neasden on 16/12/1932
GOR Gorton on 01/02/1935
IMM Immingham on 01/03/1935
NEA Neasden on 29/11/1938
IMM Immingham on 26/06/1947
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham on 26/06/1947
WDN IMM Immingham on 31/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1920 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1848)
26/08/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1849)
05/07/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1847)
21/11/1925 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1924)
30/07/1927 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 69)
01/12/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1930)
27/06/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1932)
04/03/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1924)
21/04/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 81)
28/03/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 300)
25/06/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 579)
21/09/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3015)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 29/07/1922 26/08/1922 29 days General
Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1923 30/08/1923 11 days Unclassified
After removal of nameplates at Kings Cross shed
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1924 05/07/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6167
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1925 21/11/1925 78 days General
Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1927 30/07/1927 64 days General
Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1928 01/12/1928 106 days General
Boiler number 1930 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1930 08/03/1930 29 days General  
Gorton Works 30/05/1931 27/06/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1933 04/03/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 1924 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1934 21/04/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1936 28/03/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 300 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1938 25/06/1938 78 days General
Rebuilt to class B3/2
Boiler number 579 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1939 17/06/1939 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 20/04/1940 01/06/1940 43 days General  
Gorton Works 10/06/1943 31/07/1943 52 days General  
Gorton Works 27/07/1946 21/09/1946 57 days General
Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1498
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1947 31/12/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1920 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1167, name: LLOYD GEORGE
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
02/08/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
09/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 1167C    
12/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
05/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
05/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
12/12/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
07/03/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
16/07/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
16/12/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
01/02/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
01/03/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
29/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1484 but not taken up    
26/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
31/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1498 from Immingham (IMM)    

prev prev