Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 261 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1169 Week
» 12314 Month
» 112099 Year
» 1777475 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1168 m/e 10/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6168   01/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1485   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1499   Not applied

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1920 LORD STUART OF WORTLEY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B3
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B3/110/1920
B3/2 (4-6-0)21/09/1929
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1920 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Sat 28/09/1946 off Neasden (NEA)
Service Life 25 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
GOR   Gorton (New) m/e 10/1920
IMM   Immingham m/e 04/1922
KX   Kings Cross on 06/04/1924
COP   Copley Hill (Leeds) on 27/04/1925
GOR   Gorton on 16/04/1927
IMM   Immingham on 14/05/1927
NEA   Neasden on 20/07/1928
GOR   Gorton on 14/06/1929
NEA   Neasden on 05/02/1930
GOR   Gorton on 21/02/1930
NEA   Neasden on 03/03/1930
GOR   Gorton on 21/03/1933
NEA   Neasden on 12/03/1936
     Withdrawn on 28/09/1946

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1920 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1849)
29/07/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1845)
31/10/1925 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1935)
30/06/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1929)
21/09/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 80)
28/03/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 355)
08/10/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 356)
01/06/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 65)
29/08/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3014)
06/08/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3022)
30/03/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3010)
10/10/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3002)
24/06/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3035)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 01/07/1922 29/07/1922 29 days General Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1923 01/03/1924 85 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6168
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1925 31/10/1925 99 days General Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1927 16/04/1927 57 days General    
Gorton Works 28/04/1928 30/06/1928 64 days General Boiler number 1929 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1929 21/09/1929 92 days General Rebuilt to class B3/2
Boiler number 80 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1929 14/12/1929 1 day Light Repair    
Gorton Works 18/01/1930 18/01/1930 1 day Light Repair    
Gorton Works 10/05/1930 17/05/1930 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 25/10/1930 01/11/1930 8 days Light Repair Steam chest gauge fitted
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1931 28/03/1931 50 days General Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1931 08/08/1931 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 07/11/1931 21/11/1931 15 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 03/09/1932 08/10/1932 36 days General Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1933 21/10/1933 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 28/04/1934 09/06/1934 43 days General    
Gorton Works 15/12/1934 15/12/1934 1 day Light Repair Lubricator position changed
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1935 01/06/1935 29 days General Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1936 29/08/1936 36 days General New right & left cylinders
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1937 27/03/1937 15 days Heavy    
Gorton Works 18/06/1938 06/08/1938 50 days General Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1940 30/03/1940 36 days General Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/11/1940 21/12/1940 22 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 04/09/1942 10/10/1942 37 days General Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1944 24/06/1944 29 days General Boiler number 3035 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1946 28/09/1946 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1920 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1168, name: LORD STUART OF WORTLEY
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
04/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
01/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1922. Dep: 29/07/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
   
08/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1923. Dep: 01/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6168
   
06/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
27/04/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
25/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1925. Dep: 31/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1935 (Diagram 13)
   
19/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927.    
16/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
28/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1929 (Diagram 13)
   
20/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
14/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 21/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B3/2
Boiler number 80 (Diagram 13)
   
14/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929.    
18/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 18/01/1930.    
05/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
21/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
10/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930.    
25/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Steam chest gauge fitted
   
07/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13)
   
01/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/08/1931. Dep: 08/08/1931.    
07/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931.    
03/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13)
   
21/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 21/10/1933.    
28/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934.    
15/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Lubricator position changed
   
04/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 01/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13)
   
12/03/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
25/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
New right & left cylinders
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
   
13/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 27/03/1937.    
18/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1938. Dep: 06/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13)
   
24/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13)
   
30/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940.    
04/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
   
27/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3035 (Diagram 13)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1485 but not taken up    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1499 but not taken up    
28/09/1946 Withdrawn Condemned as 6168 from Neasden (NEA)    
28/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946.    

prev