|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 06/04/1907 | 27/04/1907 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1915 | 21/08/1915 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1920 | 03/07/1920 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1333 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1922 | 29/07/1922 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1924 | 27/12/1924 | 190 days | General | Boiler number 539 (Diagram 16Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6097 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1925 | 13/06/1925 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1926 | 22/05/1926 | 85 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1928 | 07/07/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1931 | 14/03/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1932 | 24/09/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1933 | 09/12/1933 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1935 | 24/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/05/1937 | 05/06/1937 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1940 | 10/08/1940 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/4 Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1941 | 10/05/1941 | 22 days | Heavy | New cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1942 | 17/10/1942 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 36 days | General | Painted green Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 16Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1097, name: IMMINGHAM Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4818 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
06/04/1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1907. Dep: 27/04/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
03/07/1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1915. Dep: 21/08/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
24/04/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1920. Dep: 03/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1333 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
06/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1922. Dep: 29/07/1922. | ||
27/10/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
28/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1924. Dep: 27/12/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 539 (Diagram 16Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6097 |
||
03/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
06/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 13/06/1925. | ||
27/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
12/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 07/07/1928. | ||
14/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1931. Dep: 14/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
27/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
23/09/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/01/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
08/03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
28/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
10/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
15/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937. | ||
12/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 10/08/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/4 Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
19/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted |
||
30/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
28/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1492 but not taken up | ||
12/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1482 | ||
22/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. Work undertaken: Painted green Boiler number 3265 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
11/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61482 but not taken up | ||
24/11/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1482 from Ardsley (37A) | ||
01/1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton |