|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/02/1911 | 17/06/1911 | 128 days | General | Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1919 | 16/08/1919 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1141 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1921 | 18/06/1921 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1922 | 03/03/1923 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1925 | 25/04/1925 | -189 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1927 | 25/06/1927 | 92 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/1 Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1928 | 19/01/1929 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1931 | 08/09/1931 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 784 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1933 | 18/03/1933 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1933 | 16/12/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1936 | 28/03/1936 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/3 Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1938 | 15/10/1938 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1942 | 11/04/1942 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1943 | 27/03/1943 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1944 | 30/12/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1101 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4822 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
10/02/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1911. Dep: 17/06/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
06/07/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1919. Dep: 16/08/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1141 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
30/04/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1921. Dep: 18/06/1921. | ||
19/05/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
16/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1922. Dep: 03/03/1923. | ||
06/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
10/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
22/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/04/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/04/1925 | Modification | Diagram 16Sup number 1470 boiler fitted | ||
25/04/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6101 | ||
29/05/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
01/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1925. Dep: 25/04/1925. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted |
||
26/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/1 Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
17/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929. | ||
11/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 08/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 784 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
04/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/03/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933. | ||
18/03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
25/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/3 Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
03/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
25/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
11/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
25/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
10/12/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
12/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/03/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
30/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
07/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
16/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
02/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1496 but not taken up | ||
19/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1486 | ||
07/10/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1486 from Ardsley (ARD) |